BILL NUMBER: AB 935CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 601 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 25, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 25, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 22, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 30, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 16, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 23, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Salas (Principal coauthor: Senator Galgiani) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Atkins, Bigelow, Gray, Olsen, Perea, and Rendon) (Coauthors: Senators Berryhill, Cannella, Fuller, and Vidak) FEBRUARY 26, 2015 An act to add Section 140 to the Water Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 935, Salas. Water projects. Existing law establishes in the Natural Resources Agency the Department of Water Resources, which manages and undertakes planning with regard to water resources in the state. This bill would require, upon appropriation by the Legislature, the department to provide funding for a certain project provided that certain conditions are met. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 140 is added to the Water Code, to read: 140. (a) Upon appropriation by the Legislature, which shall not exceed seven million dollars ($7,000,000), the department shall provide funding for a project that substantially conforms to the project description for the Reverse Flow Pump-back Facilities on the Friant-Kern Canal Restoration Project set forth by the draft investment strategy released by the San Joaquin River Restoration Program in December 2014 if the project satisfies the conditions described in subdivision (c). (b) Funding pursuant to this section shall not exceed 80 percent of the total cost of the project. (c) The project identified in this section shall not be eligible for funding pursuant to subdivision (a) until all of the following requirements are met: (1) All feasibility studies are complete and draft environmental impact reports are available for public review. (2) The director receives commitments for not less than 75 percent of the nonstate cost-share requirement of the project. (d) A project funded pursuant to this section shall comply with any other applicable provisions of state and federal law.