California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB946 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/26/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 946AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ting FEBRUARY 26, 2015 An act  to amend Section 44268.2 of the Health and Safety Code,  relating to electric vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 946, as amended, Ting. Electric  vehicles.   vehicle c   harging stations.   Existing law, the Electric Vehicle Charging Stations Open Access Act, prohibits the charging of a subscription fee on persons desiring to use an electric vehicle charging station, as defined, and prohibits a requirement for persons to obtain membership in any club, association, or organization as a condition of using the station, except as specified. The act authorizes the State Air Resources Board to adopt interoperability billing standards for network roaming payment methods for electric vehicle charging stations if no interoperability billing standards have been adopted by a national standards organization by January 1, 2015. The act provides that if the state board adopts interoperability billing standards, all electric vehicle charging stations that require payment shall meet those standards within one year.   This bill would change the date of the state board's conditional authorization to adopt those interoperability billing standards to January 1, 2016, and would require the electric vehicle charging stations to meet those standards within 6 months.   Existing law requires the Public Utilities Commission, in consultation with the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, the State Air Resources Board, electrical corporations, and the motor vehicle industry, to evaluate policies to develop infrastructure sufficient to overcome any barriers to the widespread deployment and use of plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles and, by July 1, 2011, to adopt rules that address related matters.   This bill would express the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to increase the use of electric vehicles by improving existing infrastructure for electric vehicles.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 44268.2 of the   Health and Safety Code   is amended to read:  44268.2. (a) (1) Persons desiring to use an electric vehicle charging station that requires payment of a fee shall not be required to pay a subscription fee in order to use the station, and shall not be required to obtain membership in any club, association, or organization as a condition of using the station. The total actual charges for the use of an electric vehicle charging station, including any additional network roaming charges for nonmembers, shall be disclosed to the public at the point of sale. An electric vehicle charging station that requires payment of a fee shall allow a person desiring to use the station to pay via credit card or mobile technology, or both. (2) Notwithstanding paragraph (1), an electric vehicle charging station may offer services on a subscription- or membership-only basis provided those electric vehicle charging stations allow nonsubscribers or nonmembers the ability to use the electric vehicle charging station through the payment options detailed in paragraph (1). (b) The service provider of electric vehicle service equipment at an electric vehicle charging station or its designee shall disclose to the National Renewable Energy Laboratory the electric vehicle charging station's geographic location, a schedule of fees, accepted methods of payment, and the amount of network roaming charges for nonmembers, if any. (c) Electric vehicle charging stations shall be labeled in accordance with Part 309 of Title 16 of the Code of Federal Regulations, and, where commercially reasonable and feasible, may be clearly marked with appropriate directional signage in the parking area or facility where they are located. (d) If no interoperability billing standards have been adopted by a national standards organization by January 1,  2015,   2016,  the state board may adopt interoperability billing standards for network roaming payment methods for electric vehicle charging stations. If the state board adopts interoperability billing standards, all electric vehicle charging stations that require payment shall meet those standards within  one year.   six months. Any standards adopted by the state board shall consider other governmental or industry-developed interoperability billing standards and may adopt interoperability billing standards promulgated by an outside authoritative body.  SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to increase the use of electric vehicles by improving existing infrastructure for electric vehicles.