California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR135 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/16/2016

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 135CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 121 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 16, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 11, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Dahle FEBRUARY 8, 2016 Relative to the Officer Jack Polen Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 135, Dahle. The Officer Jack Polen Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 44 in the County of Shasta as the Officer Jack Polen Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Officer Jack Polen was born on November 4, 1957, the youngest of five sons born to Gertrude and Floyd Polen; and WHEREAS, Officer Polen knew he wanted to become a California Highway Patrolman at a young age. He joined the ROTC program at Enterprise High School, where he graduated in 1975, and went on to earn an A.A. degree in Criminal Justice from Shasta College and a B.A. in Criminal Justice from California State University, Sacramento; and WHEREAS, Officer Polen graduated from the California Highway Patrol Academy in 1980, and was stationed in the areas of Redwood City, Woodland, and Redding before being assigned to the State Highway Route 44 beat in 2002; and WHEREAS, Officer Polen's attitude, work ethic, and professionalism showed in his dedication to making State Highway Route 44 as safe as it could be; and WHEREAS, During his four years patrolling State Highway Route 44, Officer Polen drove 126,251 miles, wrote 3,436 citations, and made 125 DUI arrests, saving many lives and earning himself the nickname "The 44 Enforcer"; and WHEREAS, Officer Polen lost his battle with cancer on December 9, 2013, at the age of 56; and WHEREAS, Officer Polen was a loving husband to his wife, Danielle, and a proud and loving father to his three sons, Justin, Jared, and Connor, and his three daughters, Breann, Jamie, and Makenna; and WHEREAS, Jack Polen is remember by his loved ones as a kind, supportive, and thoughtful person, who loved life, family, and friends, and always took the time to chat with those he knew; and WHEREAS, In order to memorialize the sacrifice, dedication, and life of Officer Polen, it would be a fitting tribute to designate a portion of State Highway Route 44 in the County of Shasta in his honor; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 44 between post mile R 27.882 at Wilson Hill Road and post mile 35.930 at Airport Way in the County of Shasta as the Officer Jack Polen Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.