BILL NUMBER: ACR 177ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 1, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 9, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Frazier MAY 2, 2016 Relative to the Solano County Deputy Sheriff Hale Humphrey Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 177, Frazier. Solano County Deputy Sheriff Hale Humphrey Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 12 between Marina Boulevard and Pennsylvania Avenue in the County of Solano as the Solano County Deputy Sheriff Hale Humphrey Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Hale Humphrey grew up in the New Boston area of eastern Texas prior to enlisting in the United States Navy; and WHEREAS, After completing his naval service, Hale Humphrey settled in Fairfield, initially working for the Fairfield Police Department before becoming a deputy sheriff with the Solano County Sheriff's Office; and WHEREAS, Deputy Humphrey was active in social activities in Solano County, becoming a member of the local Elks Lodge and eventually its exalted ruler; and WHEREAS, On March 15, 1963, following a robbery at a service station, one of the fleeing suspects killed a California Highway Patrol officer, and Deputy Humphrey, who was at a roadblock set up to apprehend the suspects, was killed in the line of duty when the suspect vehicle rammed the roadblock; and WHEREAS, Deputy Humphrey, at the time of his death, was survived by his wife of 10 years, Elizabeth (Betty) Humphrey, and by his daughter Sherry Humphrey; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate to commemorate Deputy Humphrey's service and ultimate sacrifice, and to designate a portion of State Highway Route 12 in Solano County in his honor; now, therefore be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 12 between Marina Boulevard and Pennsylvania Avenue, near the south end of Union Avenue and the north end of Main Street, in the County of Solano, as the Solano County Deputy Sheriff Hale Humphrey Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of erecting appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements of the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.