BILL NUMBER: ACR 178AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gipson MAY 3, 2016 Relative to the Kevin Michael Burrell and James Wayne MacDonald Memorial Highway and the Dess K. Phipps Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 178, as amended, Gipson. Kevin Michael Burrell and James Wayne MacDonald Memorial Highway and the Dess K. Phipps Memorial Highway. This measure would designatean unspecifieda specified portion of State Highway Route91710 in the County of Los Angeles as the Kevin Michael Burrell and James Wayne MacDonald Memorial Highway and would designatean unspecifieda specified portion of State Highway Route91710 in the County of Los Angeles as the Dess K. Phipps Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the costs for appropriate signs, as specified, and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering those costs, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, Kevin Michael Burrell and James Wayne MacDonald were police officers employed by the City of Compton, who dedicated their lives to keeping its citizens safe; and WHEREAS, Kevin Michael Burrell realized that being a police officer meant more than just making arrests; he possessed a level of unparalleled compassion and understanding, taking advantage of every opportunity to help those less fortunate, and was lovingly known as the "Gentle Giant;" and WHEREAS, James Wayne MacDonald was admired by hispeers andpeers, had an amazingpersonalitypersonality, and, although he was only required to work two shifts a month,insteadchose to work two shifts a week; and WHEREAS, James Wayne MacDonald loved being a police officer and Kevin Michael Burrell was his favorite partner to ride with; and WHEREAS, On February 22, 1993, Kevin Michael Burrell and James Wayne MacDonald, ages 29 and 24, respectively, while working as patrol car partners in the City of Compton, were fatally shot by a violent gang member during a traffic stop at the intersection of Rosecrans Avenue and Dwight Avenue; and WHEREAS, Kevin Michael Burrell is survived by his son, Kevin Junior, his mother, Edna, his sister, Bridget, and his brothers, Biff, Kiki, Reggie, and Anthony, his father, Clark, having subsequently passed away; and WHEREAS, James Wayne MacDonald is survived by his mother, Toni, and his brother, Jon, his father, Jim, having subsequently passed away; and WHEREAS, Dess K. Phipps was a police officer employed by the City of Compton who dedicated his life to keeping the citizens of the City of Compton safe; and WHEREAS, Dess K. Phipps was born on June 17, 1925, in the City of Stidham in the County of McIntosh, Oklahoma, and grew up on a working farm in the City of Yuma, Arizona; and WHEREAS, Dess K. Phipps was a member of the United States Navy from June 16, 1934, to December 29, 1944, and was a veteran of World War II; and WHEREAS, At the age of 37, Dess K. Phippsiswas killed in the line of duty during a high speed vehicle pursuit of a criminal on October 12, 1962; and WHEREAS, Dess K. Phipps is survived by his brother, Williams Ross Phipps, andiswas succeeded in death by his loving wife, Pauline Verna Winder Phipps (2012), his parents Marion (1975) and Margaret Phipps (1994), and his other brother, Perry Lee Phipps (1998); now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designatesathat portion of State Highway Route91710 from State Highway Route 91 approximately at post mile 12.97 to Alondra Boulevard approximately at post mile 13.94 in the County of Los Angeles as the Kevin Michael Burrell and James Wayne MacDonald Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature hereby designatesathat portion of State Highway Route91710 from Alondra Boulevard approximately at post mile 13.945 to Rosecrans Avenue approximately at post mile 14.96 in the County of Los Angeles as the Dess K. Phipps Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting appropriate signs, which would include these special designations, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the costs, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.