California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR190 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/16/2016

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 190CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 110 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 16, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Waldron and Gipson (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Arambula, Atkins, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Bonta, Brown, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Gallagher, Gatto, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gray, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Levine, Linder, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, Olsen, Patterson, Quirk, Rendon, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Wagner, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) MAY 26, 2016 Relative to HIV Testing Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 190, Waldron. HIV Testing Day. This measure would proclaim June 27, 2016, as HIV Testing Day in California and would encourage Californians to learn their HIV status. WHEREAS, In 2014, the State Department of Public Health reported 5,551 new HIV diagnoses in California; and WHEREAS, As of June 30, 2014, the cumulative number of HIV-positive cases in California reached 50,955, and the cumulative number of HIV/AIDS cases reached 169,588; and WHEREAS, As of June 30, 2014, Whites represented 50.4 percent of all cumulative HIV-positive and HIV/AIDS cases in California, Hispanics represented 27.2 percent, Blacks represented 17.7 percent, and Asians/Pacific Islanders represented 3 percent; and WHEREAS, From 2009 to 2014, inclusive, the proportion of Latinos and Asians/Pacific Islanders in California who made up new HIV diagnoses increased; and WHEREAS, In California, African Americans are disproportionately represented among those diagnosed with HIV; and WHEREAS, In 2014, five states, including California, made up almost half of all new HIV diagnoses in the United States; and WHEREAS, More than 1.2 million people in the United States are living with an HIV infection, and that number grows by almost 50,000 each year; and WHEREAS, One in seven people with HIV do not know that they are infected, and three in 10 new HIV infections in the United States are transmitted by people who do not know that they are infected; and WHEREAS, More than 90 percent of new HIV infections in the United States could be prevented by testing and diagnosing people who have HIV and ensuring that they receive prompt and ongoing care and treatment; and WHEREAS, National HIV Testing Day is held on June 27, 2016, and should serve as an opportunity to raise awareness about the importance of HIV testing and early diagnosis of HIV; now, therefore be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the importance of getting tested for HIV; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature proclaims June 27, 2016, as HIV Testing Day in California and encourages Californians to get the facts and to learn their HIV status; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.