BILL NUMBER: ACR 35CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 76 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 26, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 22, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 27, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gonzalez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Travis Allen, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Bonta, Brown, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gordon, Gray, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Roger Hernndez, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Kim, Lackey, Levine, Linder, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Patterson, Perea, Quirk, Rendon, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) FEBRUARY 26, 2015 Relative to the 27th Annual State Scientist Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 35, Gonzalez. 27th Annual State Scientist Day. This measure would declare May 13, 2015, as the 27th Annual State Scientist Day, as a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California. WHEREAS, The state employs nearly 3,000 professional scientists in over 30 state departments working in more than 81 scientific classifications; and WHEREAS, State scientists hold graduate degrees in virtually every scientific discipline, including biology, nematology, virology, seismology, epidemiology, toxicology, and many others; and WHEREAS, State scientists are represented by the California Association of Professional Scientists (CAPS), which is dedicated to professionalism, independence, and responsible advocacy; and WHEREAS, The work of state scientists protects the public from life-threatening diseases, safeguards our wildlife and abundant natural resources, and protects our air and water from toxic waste and pollution; and WHEREAS, State scientists are required to make critical decisions every day based on rigorous scientific factfinding, and these decisions ultimately impact the lives and property of all Californians; and WHEREAS, State scientists perform important work in the areas of infectious disease prevention, oil spill prevention and cleanup, public health drinking water monitoring, the protection of agricultural crops, brownfields mitigation, chemical and radiological disaster response, and much more; and WHEREAS, CAPS cosponsors the Sacramento Regional Science and Engineering Fair, one of California's 14 regional science and engineering fairs, serving hundreds of middle and high schools in 10 California counties; and WHEREAS, State scientists host an annual State Scientist Day at the State Capitol to increase public awareness and recognition of the significant contributions made by scientists working in state government while entertaining and educating over 3,500 elementary school students with fun, hands-on science exhibits; and WHEREAS, State Scientist Day has sparked an interest in science for thousands of California schoolchildren, legislators, state employees, and members of the public, who attend the special event; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That May 13, 2015, shall be recognized as the 27th Annual State Scientist Day, and that this day shall be a tribute to the dedication and professionalism of the state scientists who work on behalf of all the residents of California; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.