California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR75 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/01/2015

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 75AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Daly (Coauthors: Assembly Members Travis Allen, Brough, Chang, Harper, Kim,  and Wagner   Wagner,   Achadjian,   Alejo,   Atkins,   Baker,  Bigelow,   Bonilla,   Bonta,   Brown,   Burke,   Campos,   Chau,   Chvez,  Chiu,   Chu,   Cooley,   Cooper,   Dababneh,   Dahle,   Dodd,   Eggman,   Frazier,   Gallagher,   Cristina Garcia,   Gatto,   Gipson,   Gomez,   Gonzalez,   Gordon,   Gray,   Grove,   Hadley,   Roger Hernndez,   Holden,   Irwin,   Jones,   Jones-Sawyer,   Lackey,   Levine,   Linder,   Lopez,   Low,   Maienschein,   Mathis,   Mayes,   McCarty,   Medina,   Mullin,   Nazarian,   Obernolte,   O'Donnell,   Olsen,   Patterson,   Perea,   Quirk,   Rodriguez,   Salas,   Santiago,   Steinorth,   Mark Stone,   Thurmond,   Ting,   Waldron,   Wilk,   Williams,   and Wood  ) (Coauthors: Senators Huff, Mendoza, Moorlach, and Nguyen) MAY 18, 2015 Relative to Disneyland Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 75, as amended, Daly. Disneyland Day. This measure would declare June 1, 2015, as Disneyland Day in recognition of the 60th anniversary of Disneyland. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, Disneyland, which is referred to as "the happiest place on earth" and has provided time-honored and beloved traditions of entertainment to generations of families in California and nationwide, will celebrate its 60th anniversary in 2015; and WHEREAS, At this time, it is appropriate to draw the special attention of the public to Disneyland and its parent organization the Walt Disney Company for their many contributions to the State of California and beyond; and WHEREAS, Created under the direct supervision of Walt Disney, a creative genius who hoped that it would be a "source of joy and inspiration to all the world," Disneyland has a greater cumulative attendance than any other theme park on the planet, having greeted over 700,000,000 visitors since it opened its doors on July 17, 1955; and WHEREAS, Walt Disney's original venture in Anaheim has expanded from a single theme park with one hotel into a full-scale resort with two world-class theme parks, approximately 2,500 hotel rooms, 150 restaurants, 85 retail locations, and the resort has grown to become one of the largest single-site employers in Orange County, directly employing 28,000 cast members and generating an economic impact of approximately $5 billion annually to the southern California economy; and WHEREAS, The creation of Disneyland was possibly the single greatest family entertainment achievement of the 20th century, introducing an entirely new concept in outdoor entertainment and establishing an icon of fun and magic known around the world which continues well into the 21st century; and WHEREAS, The myriad manifestations of the philanthropy embraced by the Walt Disney Company and its 28,000 employees are equally impressive, including when the company exemplifies its humanitarian efforts in response to natural disasters and continuously gives back to the community, whether in California, elsewhere in the United States, or worldwide; and WHEREAS, As measured for the year 2013 alone, the Walt Disney Company's philanthropy included donations of all kinds valued at $370 million, and further encompassed, among other kinds of charitable activities, over 667,000 VoluntEARS hours contributed by Disney employees participating in the company's 30-year-old VoluntEARS program, whose efforts in 2013 positively impacted an estimated 4,000,000 families and children; and WHEREAS, On the eve of Disneyland's 60th anniversary, both Walt Disney Company and its world-renowned theme park are worthy of the highest commendations for having improved the quality of life for people not only in California and elsewhere in the United States, but also worldwide by sustaining communities economically and through generous and inspiring philanthropy; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Disneyland upon the celebration of its 60th anniversary, and commends Disneyland and the Walt Disney Company for their decades-long record of enhancing the quality of life for people in California and beyond; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature declares June 1, 2015, as Disneyland Day; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.