BILL NUMBER: ACR 86INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Roger Hernndez JUNE 11, 2015 Relative to the CHP Officer William B. Wolff III Memorial Interchange. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 86, as introduced, Roger Hernndez. CHP Officer William B. Wolff III Memorial Interchange. This measure would designate the interchange at State Highway Route 10 and the 605 Freeway in the County of Los Angeles as the CHP Officer William B. Wolff III Memorial Interchange. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs, which shall include the star of the California Highway Patrol, showing this designation and, and upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, William B. Wolff III was born on January 22, 1946, in Akron, Ohio, the son of William and Barbara and the brother of Jana; and WHEREAS, Officer Wolff graduated from Upper Darby High School in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, in 1964, and attended Cal Poly Pomona shortly thereafter, where he received a degree in kinesiology; and WHEREAS, Officer Wolff was a licensed vocational nurse and also served our country as a member of the United States Navy prior to becoming a California Highway Patrol officer; and WHEREAS, Officer Wolff is remembered as the proud father of Eric William, born September 19, 1968, and Carrie Ann, born November 8, 1971. He is the grandfather of Kaylee Rose, born June 13, 2003; and WHEREAS, Officer Wolff, badge number 8342, entered the California Highway Patrol Academy on August 13, 1973, and, upon graduation, was assigned to the Baldwin Park area, where he served for approximately five years; and WHEREAS, Officer Wolff was killed in the line of duty on December 30, 1977, while making a traffic stop along the Interstate 10 freeway in Baldwin Park, when he was struck by a drunk driver. The motorist who killed Officer Wolff was charged with felony drunk driving; and WHEREAS, Officer Wolff was a hard working, dedicated officer who loved his job and enjoyed the people he worked with. He was known for being a loyal family man and a wonderful father; and WHEREAS, Officer Wolff had an incredible sense of humor. In his spare time, he enjoyed piloting, waterskiing, and spending time with his family; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Officer Wolff's great contributions and sacrifice in serving the California Highway Patrol and the citizens of California, it would be fitting to designate a portion of State Highway Route 10 in Los Angeles County in his honor; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the interchange at State Highway Route 10, post mile 31.151, and the Interstate 605 freeway in the County of Los Angeles as the CHP Officer William B. Wolff III Memorial Interchange; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting the appropriate signs, which shall include the star of the California Highway Patrol, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing these special designations, and upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.