California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1049 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/03/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1049AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 3, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 1, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 15, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 11, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hill FEBRUARY 12, 2016 An act to add Section 326  to   to, and to add and repeal Section 326.1 of,  the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1049, as amended, Hill. Public Utilities Commission: electrical and gas corporations: close call reporting  program.   programs.  Under existing law, the Public Utilities Commission has regulatory authority over public utilities, including electrical and gas corporations. The California Constitution authorizes the commission to establish rules for electrical and gas corporations, subject to control by the Legislature. This bill would  require   authorize  the commission to establish procedures and processes to implement a confidential, nonpunitive, and independent close call reporting program for purposes of facilitating the identification of accident precursors by persons familiar with the operations of electrical or gas corporations and of collecting, analyzing, and disseminating unbiased safety information. The bill would authorize any person to voluntarily submit through the program a confidential close call report that both involves an electrical or gas corporation and relates to public, employee, or contractor safety.    The bill would also require the commission to implement, through a proceeding, a close call reporting pilot program that would be consistent with the program described above.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 326 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 326. (a) The commission  shall   may  establish procedures and processes to implement a confidential, nonpunitive, and independent close call reporting program for purposes of facilitating the identification of accident precursors by persons familiar with the operations of electrical or gas corporations, including, but not limited to, employees and contractors of electrical or gas corporations, and of collecting, analyzing, and disseminating unbiased safety information. Through the program, any person, including, but not limited to, an employee or contractor of an electrical or gas corporation or a member of the public, may voluntarily submit a confidential close call report that both involves an electrical or gas corporation and relates to public, employee, or contractor safety. (b) The commission shall not use a report submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) or information derived therefrom, except for information concerning an accident or criminal offense, in an enforcement action. (c) The commission may contract with a third party to administer the program. (d) An employee of, or the employee of a contractor performing work for, an electrical or gas corporation shall not be subject to demotion, discharge, or any other form of retaliation or discrimination for participating in the close call reporting program established pursuant to this section.  SEC. 2.   Section 326.1 is added to the  Public Utilities Code   , to read:   326.1. (a) On or before July 1, 2017, the commission shall implement, through a proceeding, a confidential, nonpunitive, and independent close call reporting pilot program that is consistent with the program described in Section 326. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2022, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2022, deletes or extends that date.