BILL NUMBER: SB 1187ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 24, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 11, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 3, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 22, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lara FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1187, Lara. Claims against the state: appropriation. Existing law requires the Attorney General, who is the head of the Department of Justice, to report certain claims, settlements, and judgments against the state to the chairperson of the Senate Committee on Appropriations or the Assembly Committee on Appropriations. Existing law requires the chairperson to introduce legislation appropriating funds for the payment of the claims, settlements, and judgments. This bill would appropriate $36,555,686.61 from the General Fund to the Department of Justice to pay the judgment and any applicable interest or settlement in specified cases. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The sum of thirty-six million five hundred fifty-five thousand six hundred eighty-six dollars and sixty-one cents ($36,555,686.61) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to be allocated in accordance with the following schedule: (a) The sum of two hundred thirty-five thousand four hundred dollars ($235,400) is hereby appropriated to the Department of Justice to pay the settlement in Ballona Wetlands Land Trust v. Santa Monica Bay Restoration Commission (Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. BS154128). Any funds appropriated in excess of the amounts required for the payment of this claim shall revert to the General Fund. (b) The sum of thirty-six million three hundred twenty thousand two hundred eighty-six dollars and sixty-one cents ($36,320,286.61) is hereby appropriated to the Department of Justice to pay the judgment and any applicable interest in Pauma Band of Luiseo Mission Indians of the Pauma & Yuima Reservation v. State of California, et al. (United States District Court for the Southern District, Case No. 09CV1955). Any funds appropriated in excess of the amounts required for the payment of this claim shall revert to the General Fund. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to pay judgment and settlement claims against the state and end hardship to claimants as quickly as possible, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.