California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB120 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/15/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 120INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Anderson JANUARY 15, 2015 An act to amend Section 6051 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 120, as introduced, Anderson. Sales and use taxes. A provision of the Sales and Use Tax Law imposes a state sales tax at a rate of 43/4% of the gross receipts of the retail sale of tangible personal property in the state. This bill would make technical, nonsubstantive changes to that provision. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6051 of the Revenue and Taxation Code is amended to read: 6051. For the privilege of selling tangible personal property at  retail   retail,  a tax is  hereby  imposed upon all retailers  at the rate of 2   1/2   percent of the gross receipts of any retailer from the sale of all tangible personal property sold at retail in this state on or after August 1, 1933, and to and including June 30, 1935, and at the rate of 3 percent thereafter, and at the rate of 2   1/2   percent on and after July 1, 1943, and to and including June 30, 1949, and at the rate of 3 percent on and after July 1, 1949, and to and including July 31, 1967, and at the rate of 4 percent on and after August 1, 1967, and to and including June 30, 1972, and at the rate of 3   3/4   percent on and after July 1, 1972, and to and including June 30, 1973, and at the rate of 4   3/4   percent on and after July 1, 1973, and to and including September 30, 1973, and at the rate of 3   3/4   percent on and after October 1, 1973, and to and including March 31, 1974, and  at the rate of 43/4 percent  thereafter.   of the gross receipts of any retailer from the sale of all tangible personal property sold at retail in this state.