California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1260 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/05/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1260ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE MAY 12, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 4, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 11, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 29, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Allen FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to add Section 13383.9 to the Water Code, relating to stormwater. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1260, Allen. Stormwater: municipalities: online resource center. Under existing law, the State Water Resources Control Board and the California regional water quality control boards issue municipal separate storm sewer system national pollutant discharge elimination system permits in accordance with the federal Clean Water Act. Existing law required the state board, no later than July 1, 2009, to develop a comprehensive guidance document for evaluating and measuring the effectiveness of municipal stormwater management programs and permits, as prescribed. This bill would require the state board to establish an online resource center that addresses measures available for municipalities to comply with municipal stormwater permit requirements and would authorize the inclusion of certain information. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13383.9 is added to the Water Code, to read: 13383.9. The state board shall establish an online resource center that addresses measures available for municipalities to comply with municipal stormwater permit requirements and may include the following information: (a) Links to the following: (1) Relevant state, federal, and local agencies regarding municipal separate storm sewer system national pollutant discharge elimination system permits. (2) Water quality mitigation measures for watershed management programs or enhanced watershed management programs. (3) Various regional agencies related to stormwater, including, but not limited to, public works departments and special districts. (b) A library of scientific studies relevant to stormwater issues confronting our communities.