California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1374 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/16/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1374AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 16, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 5, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lara FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add  Section 32621.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to the San Gabriel and Lower Los Angeles Rivers and Mountains Conservancy.   Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 5795)   to Division 5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the Lower Los Angeles River Recreation and Park District.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1374, as amended, Lara.  San Gabriel and Lower Los Angeles Rivers and Mountains Conservancy: stormwater capture projects.   The Lower Los Angeles River Recreation and Park District Act.   Existing law provides a process for the establishment of recreation and park districts and provides that a recreation and park district may organize, promote, conduct, and advertise programs of community recreation, establish systems of recreation and recreation facilities, and acquire, construct, improve, maintain, and operate recreation facilities.  Existing law provides for the protection, enhancement, and restoration of rivers in this state. Existing law  establishes the San Gabriel and Lower Los Angeles Rivers and Mountains Conservancy for the purpose of, among others, providing for the public's enjoyment and enhancement of recreational and education experiences on public lands in the San Gabriel Watershed and Lower Los Angeles River.  Existing law prescribes the functions and duties of the conservancy with regard to the preservation and protection of lands and watersheds within the territory, as described, of the conservancy and imposes certain limitations on the conservancy with respect to actions that affect water or water management in those watersheds.   Existing law requires the Secretary of the Natural Resources Agency, in consultation with the Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors to the extent the board wishes to consult, to appoint the Lower Los Angeles River Working Group to develop, on or before March 1, 2017, a revitalization plan for the Lower Los Angeles River watershed that addresses the unique and diverse needs of the Lower Los Angeles River and   the communities through which it passes, as prescribed.   This bill would require the conservancy to identify projects, consistent with those limitations and the Los Angeles River Master Plan, that would maximize the capture of stormwater along the Lower Los Angeles River.   This bill would create the Lower Los Angeles River Recreation and Park District and would subject the district to specified existing laws governing recreation and park districts, except as provided. The bill would authorize 9 specified city councils and the Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors to appoint the initial board of directors of the district. The bill would require the initial board of directors to adopt a description of the territory to be included in the district and other specified information that existing law requires from the proponents for the formation of a new recreation and park district. The bill would further prescribe the functions and duties of the district, including, but not limited to, promoting the development of open space and parks along the Lower Los Angeles River. The bill would require the district to conduct those functions and duties in coordination with the Lower Los Angeles River Working Group and the San Gabriel and Lower Los Angeles Rivers and Mountains Conservancy.   This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the Lower Los Angeles River Recreation and Park District.   The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program:  no   yes  . THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 5795) is added to Division 5 of the   Public Resources Code   , to read:   CHAPTER 4.5. LOWER LOS ANGELES RIVER RECREATION AND PARK DISTRICT ACT Article 1. General Provisions 5795. The Lower Los Angeles River Recreation and Park District is hereby created. 5795.2. Except as otherwise provided in this chapter, the Lower Los Angeles River Recreation and Park District shall be subject to Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 5780). 5795.5. For purposes of this chapter, "district" means the Lower Los Angeles River Recreation and Park District. Article 2. Administration 5795.10. Notwithstanding Article 4 (commencing with Section 5783) of Chapter 4, the initial board of directors of the district shall consist of no more than 11 members, as follows: (a) The city council of each of the following cities may appoint one representative: (1) The City of Vernon. (2) The City of Maywood. (3) The City of Bell. (4) The City of Bell Gardens. (5) The City of Cudahy. (6) The City of Lynwood. (7) The City of Compton. (8) The City of Paramount. (9) The City of Long Beach. (b) The Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors may appoint two public members. (c) A person appointed to the board of directors shall serve at the pleasure of the city council or county board of supervisors that made the appointment. 5795.12. The board of directors may be reorganized pursuant to Article 6 (commencing with Section 5785) of Chapter 4. Article 3. Power and Duties 5795.20. In addition to the powers enumerated in Article 7 (commencing with Section 5786) of Chapter 4, the district shall do all of the following: (a) Promote the development of open space and parks along the Lower Los Angeles River. (b) Identify funding and resources to promote the revitalization of the Lower Los Angeles River and open spaces along the river, for the benefit and enjoyment of local communities. (c) Acquire, construct, improve, maintain, and operate parks and open space along the Lower Los Angeles River. 5795.21. The district shall conduct the activities specified in Section 5795.20 in coordination with the Lower Los Angeles River Working Group established pursuant to Section 32622 and the San Gabriel and Lower Los Angeles Rivers and Mountains Conservancy established pursuant to Division 22.8 (commencing with Section 32600), which have certain responsibilities regarding the Lower Los Angeles River. 5795.23. Within a reasonable time, the initial board of directors shall, by ordinance or resolution, adopt a description of the territory to be included in the district and any other information that would be required from the proponents for the formation of a new recreation and park district, as provided in Section 5782.1.   SEC. 2.   The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the urgent need for local park space along the Lower Los Angeles River and the communities through which it passes.   SEC. 3.   No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because a local agency or school district has the authority to levy service charges, fees, or assessments sufficient to pay for the program or level of service mandated by this act, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code.       SECTION 1.   Section 32621.5 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 32621.5. The conservancy shall identify projects, consistent with the Los Angeles River Master Plan and this chapter, that would maximize the capture of stormwater along the Lower Los Angeles River.