California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1383 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/15/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1383AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 15, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 12, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lara (Coauthors: Senators Allen, Hancock, and Hill)  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Gonzalez   )  FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 39730.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1383, as amended, Lara. Short-lived climate pollutants. The California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 designates the State Air Resources Board as the state agency charged with monitoring and regulating sources of emissions of greenhouse gases. The state board is required to adopt a statewide greenhouse gas emissions limit equivalent to the statewide greenhouse gas emissions level in 1990 to be achieved by 2020. The state board is also required to complete a comprehensive strategy to reduce emissions of short-lived climate pollutants, as defined, in the state. This bill would require the state board, no later than January 1, 2018, to approve and begin implementing that comprehensive strategy to reduce emissions of short-lived climate pollutants to achieve a reduction in methane by 40%, hydrofluorocarbon gases by 40%, and anthropogenic black carbon by 50% below 2013 levels by 2030, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) Short-lived climate pollutants, such as black carbon, fluorinated gases, and methane, are powerful climate forces that have a dramatic and detrimental effect on air quality, public health, and climate change. (b) These pollutants create a warming influence on the climate that is many times more potent than that of carbon dioxide. (c) These toxic air contaminants also are a significant environmental risk factor for premature death. (d) Reducing these emissions can have an immediate beneficial impact on climate change and on public health. (e) To the extent possible, efforts to reduce emissions of short-lived climate pollutants should focus on areas of the state that are disproportionally affected by poor air quality. SEC. 2. Section 39730.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 39730.5. (a) No later than January 1, 2018, the state board shall approve and begin implementing the comprehensive short-lived climate pollutant strategy developed pursuant to Section 39730 to achieve a reduction in the statewide emissions of methane by 40 percent, hydrofluorocarbon gases by 40 percent, and anthropogenic black carbon by 50 percent below 2013 levels by 2030. (b) Prior to approving the short-lived climate pollutant strategy pursuant to subdivision (a), the state board shall do all of the following: (1) Coordinate with other state and local agencies and districts to develop measures identified as part of the strategy. (2) Provide a forum for public engagement by holding at least three public hearings in geographically diverse locations throughout the state. (3) Evaluate the best-available scientific, technological, and economic information to ensure that the strategy is cost effective and technologically feasible. (4) Incorporate and prioritize, as appropriate, measures and actions that provide the following cobenefits: (A) Job growth and local economic benefits in the state. (B) Public health benefits for residents, particularly in disadvantaged communities identified pursuant to Section 39711. (C) Potential for new innovation in technology, energy, and resource management practices. (c) The state board shall publicly notice the strategy described in subdivision (a) and post a copy of that strategy on the state board's Internet Web site at least one month prior to the state board approving  it   the strategy  pursuant to subdivision (a).