California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1398 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/31/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1398AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Leyva FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 116885 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1398, as amended, Leyva. Public water systems: lead pipes. Existing law requires public water systems to take specified actions to test for and remediate certain contaminants in drinking water, including lead and copper. Existing law prohibits the use of any pipe, pipe or plumbing fitting or fixture, solder, or flux that is not lead free in the installation or repair of any public water system or any plumbing in a facility providing water for human consumption, except as specified. This bill would require a public water system to compile an inventory of lead pipes in use by July 1, 2018, and, after completing the inventory, to provide a timeline for replacement of lead pipes in the system to the  board. This bill would require the board to establish best practices to ensure that chemicals introduced into public water systems do not create corrosion or contamination within the system.   State Water Resources Control Board.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 116885 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 116885. (a) By July 1, 2018, a public water system shall compile an inventory of lead pipes in use. (b) After completing the inventory required pursuant to subdivision (a), a public water system shall provide a timeline for replacement of lead pipes in the system to the State Water Resources Control Board.  (c) The State Water Resources Control Board shall establish best practices to ensure that chemicals introduced into public water systems do not create corrosion or contamination within the system.   (d)  (   c)  For the purposes of this section, "public water system" has the  same  meaning  as  provided in Section 116275.