BILL NUMBER: SB 1398AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 20, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Leyva FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 116885 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1398, as amended, Leyva. Public water systems: lead pipes. Existing law requires public water systems to take specified actions to test for and remediate certain contaminants in drinking water, including lead and copper. Existing law prohibits the use of any pipe, pipe or plumbing fitting or fixture, solder, or flux that is not lead free in the installation or repair of any public water system or any plumbing in a facility providing water for human consumption, except as specified. This bill would require a public water system to compile an inventory of known lead pipes in use in its system and identify areas that may have lead pipes in use in its system by July 1,2018, and,2018. This bill would require a public water system, after completing the inventory, to provide a timeline for replacement of known lead pipes in the system to the State Water Resources Control Board. This bill would require, by July 1, 2020, a public water system with areas that may have lead pipes in use in its system to either determine the existence or absence of lead pipes in these areas and provide that information to the state board or provide a timeline for replacement of pipes whose content cannot be determined to the state board. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 116885 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 116885. (a) By July 1, 2018, a public water system shall compile an inventory of known lead pipes inuse.use in its system and identify areas that may have lead pipes in use in its system. (b) (1) After completing the inventory required pursuant to subdivision (a), a public water system shall provide a timeline for replacement of known lead pipes intheits system to the State Water Resources Control Board. (2) By July 1, 2020, a public water system with areas that may have lead pipes in use in its system shall do either of the following: (A) Determine the existence or absence of lead pipes in these areas and provide that information to the State Water Resources Control Board. (B) Provide a timeline for replacement of pipes whose content cannot be determined to the State Water Resources Control Board. (c) For the purposes of this section, "public water system" has the same meaning as provided in Section 116275.