California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1398 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/30/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1398AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 20, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Leyva FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 116885 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1398, as amended, Leyva. Public water systems: lead  pipes.   service lines.  Existing law requires public water systems to take specified actions to test for and remediate certain contaminants in drinking water, including lead and copper. Existing law prohibits the use of any pipe, pipe or plumbing fitting or fixture, solder, or flux that is not lead free in the installation or repair of any public water system or any plumbing in a facility providing water for human consumption, except as specified. This bill would require a public water system to compile an inventory of known lead  pipes   service lines  in use in its  distribution  system and identify areas that may have lead  pipes   service lines  in use in its  distribution  system by July 1, 2018. This bill would require a public water system, after completing the inventory, to provide a timeline for replacement of known lead  pipes   service lines  in the  distribution  system to the State Water Resources Control Board. This bill would require, by July 1, 2020, a public water system with areas that may have lead  pipes   service lines  in use in its  distribution  system to either determine the existence or absence of lead  pipes   service lines  in these areas and provide that information to the  state  board or provide a timeline for replacement of  pipes   the pipes, tubings, and   fittings  whose content cannot be determined  to the state board.   that connect a water main to an individual water meter or service connection. This bill would require the board to approve a replacement timeline, as specified.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 116885 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 116885. (a) By July 1, 2018, a public water system shall compile an inventory of known lead  pipes   service lines  in use in its  distribution  system and identify areas that may have lead  pipes   service lines  in use in its  distribution  system. (b) (1) After completing the inventory required pursuant to subdivision (a), a public water system shall provide a timeline for replacement of known lead  pipes   service lines  in  use in  its  distribution  system to the  State Water Resources Control Board.   board.  (2) By July 1, 2020, a public water system with areas that may have lead  pipes  service lines  in use in its  distribution  system shall do either of the following: (A) Determine the existence or absence of lead  pipes   service lines  in  these areas   use in its distribution system  and provide that information to the  State Water Resources Control Board.   board.  (B) Provide a timeline  to the board  for replacement of  pipes   pipes, tubings, and fittings  whose content cannot be determined  to the State Water Resources Control Board.   that connect   a water main to an individual water meter or service connection.   (c) The board shall approve a timeline established pursuant to subdivision (b) as follows:   (1) The board shall review a public water system's proposed timeline for lead service line replacement and within, 30 days of submission of the timeline to the board, do either of the following:   (A) Approve the proposed timeline.   (B) Deny the proposed timeline and propose a revised timeline to the public water system. The board shall explain to the public water system, in writing, why the public water system's timeline was not approved, the factors that the board used to propose a revised timeline, and why the board used those factors.   (2) If the board fails to act within 30 days of the submission of the timeline, the timeline shall be deemed approved.   (3) If the public water system rejects the board's proposed revised timeline, the public water system and the board shall develop a compromise timeline within 30 days.   (4) An approved timeline or a compromise timeline shall be a public record and available on the board's Internet Web site.   (c)   (d)  For the purposes of this  section, "public water system" has the same meaning as provided in Section 116275.   section:   (1) "Board" means the State Water Resources Control Board.   (2) "Lead service line" has the same meaning as in Section 64671.35 of Title 22 of the California Code of Regulations.   (3) "Public water system" has the same meaning as in Section 116275.