California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1405 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/28/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1405AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Pavley FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to  amend Section 43866 of   add Sections 39602.6 and 44258.6 to  the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1405, as amended, Pavley.  Alternative fuels.   Zero-emission vehicles: transportation systems.   (1) Existing law describes the powers and duties of the State Air Resources Board relating to reducing emissions of air pollutants. Existing law requires the state board to adopt and implement emission standards for new motor vehicles. Existing law authorizes the state board to adopt regulations in furtherance of its powers and duties.   This bill would require the state board, by March 1, 2017, to revise its zero-emission vehicle standard regulation to expand the definition of "transportation systems eligible for zero-emission vehicle credits" under that regulation to include additional entities utilizing fleets of zero-emission vehicles, including rental car companies, transportation network companies, taxicab companies, and car-sharing companies, to the extent that the operations of those entities involve ridesharing features offered by those entities that reduce per-passenger emissions.   (2) The Charge Ahead California Initiative, administered by the state board, includes goals of, among other things, placing in service at least 1,000,000 zero-emission and near-zero-emission vehicles by January 1, 2023, and increasing access for disadvantaged, low-income, and moderate-income communities and consumers to zero-emission and near-zero-emission vehicles.   This bill would require the state board, as part of the initiative, to develop and implement a pilot program to provide grants to transit operators to subsidize cost-effective rides serving disadvantaged communities through the use of zero-emission vehicles that are utilized by transportation systems that are eligible for zero-emission vehicle credits, in a manner that complements the transit service offered by the transit operator.   Existing law requires, no later than June 30, 2007, the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, in partnership with the State Air Resources Board, and in consultation with specified state agencies, to develop and adopt a state plan to increase the use of alternative fuels, as defined.   This bill would make technical, nonsubstantive changes to those provisions.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 39602.6 is added to the   Health and Safety Code   , to read:   39602.6. On or before March 1, 2017, the state board, shall revise the regulations adopted by the state board relative to zero-emission vehicle standards to expand the definition of "transportation systems eligible for zero-emission vehicle credits" under that regulation to include additional entities utilizing fleets of zero-emission vehicles, including rental car companies, transportation network companies, taxicab companies, and car-sharing companies, to the extent that the operations of those entities involve ridesharing features offered by those entities that reduce per-passenger emissions.   SEC. 2.   Section 44258.6 is added to the   Health and Safety Code   , to read:   44258.6. In addition to its other activities authorized by this chapter, the state board shall develop and implement a pilot program to provide grants to transit operators to subsidize cost-effective rides serving disadvantaged communities through the use of zero-emission vehicles that are utilized by transportation systems that are eligible for zero-emission vehicle credits pursuant to Section 39206.6, in a manner that complements the transit service offered by the transit operator.   SECTION 1.   Section 43866 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 43866. Not later than June 30, 2007, the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, in partnership with the state board, and in consultation with the State Water Resources Control Board, the Department of Food and Agriculture, and other relevant state agencies, shall develop and adopt a state plan to increase the use of alternative transportation fuels. (a) The plan shall include an evaluation of alternative fuels on a full fuel-cycle assessment of emissions of criteria air pollutants, air toxics, greenhouse gases, water pollutants, and other substances that are known to damage human health; impacts on petroleum consumption; and other matters the state board deems necessary. (b) The plan shall set goals for the years 2012, 2017, and 2022 for increased alternative fuel use in the state that accomplishes all of the following: (1) Optimizes the environmental and public health benefits of alternative fuels, including, but not limited to, reductions in criteria air pollutants, greenhouse gases, and water pollutants consistent with existing or future state board regulations in the most cost-effective manner possible. (2) Ensures that there is no net material increase in air pollution, water pollution, or any other substances that are known to damage human health. (3) Minimizes the economic costs to the state, if any. (4) Maximizes the economic benefits of producing alternative fuels in the state. (5) Considers issues related to consumer acceptance and costs and identifies methods to overcome any barriers to alternative fuel use. (c) The plan shall recommend policies to ensure alternative fuel goals are attained, including, but not limited to, all of the following: (1) Standards on transportation fuels and vehicles. (2) Requirements, financial incentives, and other policy mechanisms to ensure that vehicles capable of operating on alternative fuels use those fuels to the maximum extent feasible. (3) Requirements, financial incentives, and other policy mechanisms to ensure that alternative fuel fueling stations are available to drivers of alternative fuel vehicles. (4) Incentives, requirements, programs, or other mechanisms to encourage the research, development, demonstration, commercialization, manufacturing, or production of vehicles that use alternative fuels.