BILL NUMBER: SB 1475CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 158 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 19, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 19, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 5, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 4, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Governmental Organization (Senators Hall (Chair), Berryhill, Block, Gaines, Galgiani, Glazer, Hernandez, Hill, Hueso, Lara, McGuire, Runner, and Vidak) MARCH 7, 2016 An act to amend Section 17071 of the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1475, Committee on Governmental Organization. State warrants: records. Existing law requires the Controller and Treasurer to each keep a register of all canceled warrants showing the number, date, and amount of each warrant, the fund out of which it was payable, and the date of cancellation. This bill would instead require the Controller to keep a record of all canceled warrants. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 17071 of the Government Code is amended to read: 17071. The Controller shall keep a record of all canceled warrants.