California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB193 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/18/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 193AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 18, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Veterans Affairs (Senators Nielsen (Chair), Allen, Hueso, Nguyen, and Roth) FEBRUARY 10, 2015 An act to amend  Section 64   Sections 102 and 451  of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to  veterans.   the state militia.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 193, as amended, Committee on Veterans Affairs. Veterans.  Existing law adopts the Uniform Code of Military Justice, and the Manual for Courts-Martial, as governing and applicable to the active state militia, including the California National Guard.   This bill would delete outdated references to executive orders and statutes creating the Manual for Courts-Martial and the Uniform Code of Military Justice, and would update a reference to the National Defense Authorization Act.   Existing law establishes a California Veterans Board, consisting of 7 members appointed by the Governor, subject to confirmation by the Senate. Among other things, existing law requires the board to advise the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Secretary of Veterans Affairs on policies for operations of the department.   This bill would make technical, nonsubstantive changes to those provisions.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 102 of the   Military and Veterans Code   is amended to read:  102. The Uniform Code of Military Justice (Chapter 47 (commencing with Section 801) of Title 10 of the United States Code) and the rules and regulations adopted thereunder, together with the Manual for Courts-Martial, United States,  1984 (Executive Order 12473 of April 13, 1984, as amended),  are hereby adopted as a part of this code and shall govern and be applicable, except as otherwise provided in this code or in regulations adopted by the Adjutant General, to the active militia, including the California National Guard.  SEC. 2.   Section 451 of the   Military and Veterans Code   is amended to read:  451.  (a)    The constitution and jurisdiction of general courts-martial, special courts-martial, summary courts-martial, and courts of inquiry, the form and manner in which the proceedings are conducted and recorded, the forms of oaths and affirmations taken in the administration of military law by such courts, the limits of punishment, and the proceedings in the revision thereof, shall be governed by the terms of the Articles of War, the National Defense  Authorization  Act, the laws and regulations governing the Army of the United States and the United States Air Force, and the law and procedure of similar courts of the United States Army, and the United States Air Force, except as otherwise provided in this chapter.  From and after May 31, 1951, the   (b)     The  provisions of the Uniform Code of Military  Justice (Public Law 506, Eighty-first Congress, Second Session, Chapter 169)   Justice, and  the rules and regulations published thereunder, shall govern and be applicable except as otherwise provided in this code to the active militia including the California National Guard.  SECTION 1.   Section 64 of the Military and Veterans Code is amended to read: 64. There is in state government a California Veterans Board.