California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB270 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/04/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 270AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 22, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 14, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 5, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 14, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Mendoza FEBRUARY 19, 2015 An act to add Section 8041 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to court reporters. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 270, as amended, Mendoza. Shorthand reporting services. Existing law provides for the certification and regulation of shorthand reporters and for the regulation of shorthand reporting corporations by the Court Reporters Board of California within the Department of Consumer Affairs.  The department is under the control of the Director of Consumer Affairs.  Under existing law, a shorthand reporting corporation is a corporation authorized to render professional services, as defined, as long as that corporation and all of its shareholders, officers, directors, and employees rendering professional services who are certified shorthand reporters are in compliance with specified provisions of law. Existing law also provides for the formation or registration of various legal entities transacting business in this state. This bill would authorize the  Attorney General, the Director of Consumer Affairs, and the  Court Reporters Board of California to seek injunctive relief or issue citations, fines, and other penalties  in accordance with existing law  against corporations, persons, or entities, whether foreign or domestic, that for a fee or other financial consideration, offer, offer to arrange for, render, or provide the services of a certified shorthand reporter, for violations of provisions governing oral depositions inside this state imposed by the Civil Discovery Act, Moscone-Knox Professional Corporation Act, and laws governing the practice of shorthand reporting. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8041 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 8041. (a) The  Attorney General, the Director of Consumer Affairs, and the  board may seek injunctive relief or issue citations, fines, and other penalties  in accordance with existing law  against corporations, persons, or entities, whether foreign or domestic, that for a fee or other financial consideration, offer, offer to arrange for, render, or provide the services of a certified shorthand reporter, for violations of the following: (1) Chapter 9 of Title 4 of Part 4 (commencing with Section 2025.010) of the Code of Civil Procedure. (2) Part 4 of Division 3 of Title 1 (commencing with Section 13400) of the Corporations Code. (3) This chapter (commencing with Section 8000). (4) Section 2475 of Title 16 of the California Code of Regulations, as that section read on January 1, 2016. (b) Nothing in this section shall be  construed to authorize or prohibit an individual without a certification issued pursuant to this chapter to practice shorthand reporting, as defined in Section 8017, or  construed to authorize  or prohibit  the provision of shorthand reporting services by a foreign corporation in violation of subdivision (c) of Section 13401 of the Corporations  Code or   Code, or construed  to authorize  or prohibit  violations of Section 8044.