California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB271 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/28/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 271AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Gaines FEBRUARY 19, 2015 An act to add Section 626.12 to the Penal Code, relating to unmanned aircraft systems. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 271, as amended, Gaines. Unmanned aircraft systems. Existing law makes it a crime to possess a firearm within 1,000 feet of a public or private school providing instruction in kindergarten or grades 1 to 12, inclusive. Existing law also makes it a crime to possess specified knives or blades on the grounds of a public or private school providing instruction in kindergarten or grades 1 to 12, inclusive. This bill would make it an infraction to operate an unmanned aircraft system on or above the grounds of a public school providing instruction in kindergarten or grades 1 to 12, inclusive, during school hours and without the written permission of the school principal or higher authority, or his or her designee, or equivalent school authority. The bill would also make it an infraction to use an unmanned aircraft system to capture images of public school grounds providing instruction in kindergarten or grades 1 to 12, inclusive, during school hours and without the written permission of the school principal or higher authority, or his or her designee, or equivalent school authority. The bill would define school hours for its purposes as during any school session, extracurricular activity, or event sponsored by or participated in by the school, and the one-hour periods immediately preceding and following any session, activity, or event. The bill would provide for a warning for a first  violation, a fine of no more than $50 for the 2nd violation of its provisions,   violation  and a fine of no more than $200 for each subsequent violation. The bill would exempt from its provisions any publisher, editor, reporter, or other person connected with or employed by a newspaper, magazine, or other periodical publication,  a radio or television station,  or by a press association or wire service, unless the principal or the principal's designee has requested that the person cease the operation of the unmanned aircraft system on the basis that the operation of the unmanned aircraft system would be disruptive of, or interfere with, classes of the public school program. The bill would also exempt law enforcement from its provisions. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 626.12 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 626.12. (a) Unless authorized by federal law, it shall be an infraction to operate an unmanned aircraft system on or above the grounds of a public school providing instruction in kindergarten or grades 1 to 12, inclusive, during school hours and without the written permission of the school principal or higher authority, or his or her designee, or equivalent school authority. (b) Unless authorized by federal law, it shall be an infraction to use an unmanned aircraft system to capture images of public school grounds providing instruction in kindergarten or grades 1 to 12, inclusive, during school hours and without the written permission of the school principal or higher authority, or his or her designee, or equivalent school authority. (c) A violation of this section shall be punished as follows: (1)  A   Upon a first conviction, a  warning shall be  given upon a first violation of this section.   given.  (2) Upon a second  and any subsequent  conviction under this section, a fine of no more than  fifty dollars ($50).   two hundred dollars ($200).   (3) Upon a third and any subsequent conviction under this section, a fine of no more than two hundred dollars ($200).  (d) For the purposes of this section, "unmanned aircraft system" means an unmanned aircraft and associated elements, including communication links and the components that control the unmanned aircraft, that are required for the pilot in command to operate safely and efficiently in the national airspace system. (e) For the purposes of this  section  section,  "school hours" means during any school session, extracurricular activity, or event sponsored by or participated in by the school, and the one-hour periods immediately preceding and following any session, activity, or event. (f) This section shall not apply to a publisher, editor, reporter, or other person connected with or employed by a newspaper, magazine, or other periodical publication,  or by a radio or television station,  or by a press association or wire service, or any person who has been so connected or employed unless a request that the person cease using an unmanned aircraft system at a public school building or public school grounds is made by the principal, or the designee of the principal, on the basis that the continued presence of the unmanned aircraft system used by the person would be disruptive of, or would interfere with, classes or other activities of the public school program. (g) This section shall not apply to the operation of an unmanned aircraft system by law enforcement. SEC. 2. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.