BILL NUMBER: SB 295AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 19, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 24, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Jackson (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Williams) FEBRUARY 23, 2015 An act to add Section 51015.1 to the Government Code, relating to pipeline safety. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 295, as amended, Jackson. Pipeline safety: inspections. Under the Elder California Pipeline Safety Act of 1981, the State Fire Marshal exercises safety regulatory jurisdiction over intrastate pipelines used for the transportation of hazardous or highly volatile liquid substances. The act authorizes the State Fire Marshal to exercise safety regulatory jurisdiction over portions of interstate pipelines located within the state and subject to an agreement between the United States Secretary of Transportation and the State Fire Marshal. The act authorizes the State Fire Marshal to enter, inspect, and examine, at reasonable times and in a reasonable manner, the records and properties of any pipeline operators that are required to be inspected and examined to determine whether the pipeline operator is in compliance with the act. This bill wouldrequirerequire, commencing January 1, 2017, the State Fire Marshal, or an officer or employee authorized by the State Fire Marshal, to annually inspect all intrastate pipelines and operators of intrastate pipelines under the jurisdiction of the State FireMarshal.Marshal, and would require the State Fire Marshal to adopt regulations implementing this provision by that date. The bill wouldrequireprohibit the State FireMarshal, to the maximum extent possible, to becomeMarshal from becoming an inspection agentby entering into an agreement withfor specified interstate pipelines unless all regulatory and enforcement authority over those pipelines is transferred to the State Fire Marshal from the federal Pipeline and Hazardous Materials SafetyAdministration, as specified.Administration. The bill would require the State Fire Marshal to revise specified fees assessed to cover the costs associated with this measure. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51015.1 is added to the Government Code, to read: 51015.1. (a)TheCommencing January 1, 2017, the State Fire Marshal, or an officer or employee authorized by the State Fire Marshal, shall annually inspect all intrastate pipelines and operators of intrastate pipelines under the jurisdiction of the State Fire Marshal to ensure compliance with applicable laws and regulations. By January 1, 2017, the State Fire Marshal shall adopt regulations implementing this subdivision. (b) For portions of interstate pipelines that are not under the jurisdiction of the State Fire Marshal pursuant to Section 51010.6, the State Fire Marshalshall, to the maximum extent possible,shall not become an inspection agentthrough entering into an interstate inspection agent agreement withfor those pipelines unless all regulatory and enforcement authority over those pipelines is transferred to the State Fire Marshal from the federal Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration. (c) The State Fire Marshal shall revise the fee assessed pursuant to Section 51019 to a level sufficient to cover the costs associated with the implementation of this section.