BILL NUMBER: SB 369ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 16, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Block FEBRUARY 24, 2015 An act to add Section 60902 to the Education Code, relating to education data systems. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 369, Block. California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System: pupils of military families. Existing law establishes the California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System, as provided, and requires the system to have specified characteristics, including, among other things, the capability to monitor pupil achievement on certain tests and the high school exit examination from year to year and school to school. Existing law also ratifies the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children with the purpose of removing barriers to educational success imposed on children of military families due to the frequent moves and deployment of their parents. This bill would require, on or before July 1, 2016, the Superintendent of Public Instruction to add a reporting process within the California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System requiring local educational agencies to report the enrollment of pupils of military families, as defined. The bill would require the State Department of Education to include pupils of military families as an indicator for specified purposes. The bill would prohibit this data from being used to compile reports required by specified federal provisions. By requiring local educational agencies to report this information, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60902 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60902. (a) On or before July 1, 2016, the Superintendent shall add a reporting process within the California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System requiring local educational agencies to report the enrollment of pupils of military families. (b) The department shall include pupils of military families as an indicator for purposes of Section 60901. (c) Data collected pursuant to this section shall not be used to compile reports required by the federal No Child Left Behind Act of 2001 (20 U.S.C. Sec. 6301 et seq.), including, but not limited to, dropout and graduation rates. (d) The implementation of this section shall not subject the department to a loss of funding pursuant to the conditions specified in Provision 16 of Item 6100-001-0890 of the Budget Act of 2015. (e) For purposes of this section, "pupils of military families" means pupils whose parent or legal guardian is an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States. SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.