California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB384 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/04/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 384AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Leyva FEBRUARY 24, 2015 An act to add Section 980.7 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veteran housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 384, as amended, Leyva. Veteran housing: multifamily units: underserved veterans. Existing law provides various programs and bond issuances to provide housing for veterans, as defined, including the Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Act of 2014, which provides for the acquisition, construction, rehabilitation, and preservation of affordable multifamily supportive housing, affordable transitional housing, affordable rental housing, or related facilities for veterans and their families. This bill would require, for all multifamily housing units acquired, constructed, rehabilitated, or preserved on or after January 1,  2016,   2017,  for the purpose of housing veterans, that a percentage of the state funds to be used in the  project   act  be reserved for housing for underserved veterans, as defined, the percentage  of the state funds  to be determined by the Department of Veterans  Affairs in consultation with the appropriate local agencies.   Affairs, as specified.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 980.7 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read: 980.7. (a) For all multifamily housing units acquired, constructed, rehabilitated, or preserved on or after January 1,  2016,   2017,  for the purpose of housing veterans, a percentage of the state funds to be used in the  project   act  shall be reserved for housing for underserved veterans. The percentage reserved shall be determined by the department, in consultation with the appropriate local agencies. (b) For purposes of this section, "underserved veterans"  shall have the meaning determined by the department based on the needs of veterans at the time funding is awarded.   means those veterans either experiencing or at risk of experiencing homelessness at a disproportionate rate to their veteran or nonveteran counterparts, as determined by the most recent United States Department of Housing and Urban Development Annual Homeless Assessment Report (AHAR) that includes an assessment of veteran homelessness, or other similar source the department deems appropriate.   (c) The department shall determine the percentage of funds to be reserved annually pursuant to subdivision (a), with the first determination to be made on July 1, 2017, and thereafter each year on July 1. The determination shall be made using the most recently released AHAR that includes an assessment of veteran homelessness, or other similar source that the department deems appropriate.