California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB384 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/06/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 384AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 6, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Leyva FEBRUARY 24, 2015 An act to add Section 980.7 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veteran housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 384, as amended, Leyva. Veteran housing: multifamily units: underserved veterans. Existing  law provides various programs and bond issuances to provide housing for veterans, as defined, including   law,  the Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Act of 2014,  which   (the act)  provides for the acquisition, construction, rehabilitation, and preservation of affordable multifamily supportive housing, affordable transitional housing, affordable rental housing, or related facilities for veterans and their families.  Existing law, the Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Bond Act of 2014 (bond act), an initiative measure enacted by the voters as Proposition 41 at the June 3, 2014, primary election, authorized $600 million in bonds to provide multifamily housing to low-income veterans and supportive housing for homeless veterans, through the Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Act of 2014.  This bill would require, for all multifamily housing units acquired, constructed, rehabilitated, or preserved on or after January 1, 2017, for the purpose of housing veterans, that a percentage of the  state   bond act  funds to be used  in   for purposes of  the act be reserved for housing for underserved veterans, as defined, the percentage of the  state   bond act  funds to be determined by the Department of Veterans Affairs, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 980.7 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read: 980.7. (a) For all multifamily housing units acquired, constructed, rehabilitated, or preserved on or after January 1, 2017, for the purpose of housing veterans, a percentage of the state funds to be used  in the act   for purposes of the Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Act of 2014  shall be reserved for housing for underserved veterans. The percentage reserved shall be determined by the  department,   department  in consultation with the appropriate local agencies. (b) For purposes of this section, "underserved veterans" means those veterans either experiencing or at risk of experiencing homelessness at a disproportionate rate to their veteran or nonveteran counterparts, as determined by the most recent United States Department of Housing and Urban Development Annual Homeless Assessment Report (AHAR) that includes an assessment of veteran homelessness, or other similar source the department deems appropriate. (c) The department shall determine the percentage of funds  from the Housing for Veterans Fund established pursuant to Section 998.44  to be reserved annually pursuant to subdivision (a), with the first determination to be made on July 1, 2017, and thereafter each year on July 1. The determination shall be made using the most recently released AHAR that includes an assessment of veteran homelessness, or other similar source that the department deems appropriate.  (d) If there are insufficient applications for proposed housing projects meeting the requirements of subdivision (a), the reserved funding shall revert back to the Housing for Veterans Fund and be available for other purposes authorized by the act.