BILL NUMBER: SB 384AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 21, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 6, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Leyva FEBRUARY 24, 2015 An act to add Section 980.7 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating toveteranveterans housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 384, as amended, Leyva.VeteranVeterans housing: multifamily units: underserved veterans. Existing law, the Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Act of 2014 (the act), provides for the acquisition, construction, rehabilitation, and preservation of affordable multifamily supportive housing, affordable transitional housing, affordable rental housing, or related facilities for veterans and their families. Existing law, the Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Bond Act of 2014 (bond act), an initiative measure enacted by the voters as Proposition 41 at the June 3, 2014, primary election, authorized $600 million in bonds to provide multifamily housing to low-income veterans and supportive housing for homeless veterans, through the act. This bill would require, for all multifamily housing units acquired, constructed, rehabilitated, or preserved on or after January 1, 2017, for the purpose of housing veterans, that a percentage of the bond act funds to be used for purposes of the act be reserved for housing for underserved veterans, asdefined,defined. The bill would require the percentage of the bond act funds to be determined by the Department of Veterans Affairs, the California Housing Finance Agency, and the Department of Housing and Community Development collectively, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 980.7 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read: 980.7. (a) For all multifamily housing units acquired, constructed, rehabilitated, or preserved on or after January 1, 2017, for the purpose of housing veterans, a percentage of the state funds to be used for purposes of the Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Act of 2014 shall be reserved for housing for underserved veterans. The percentage reserved shall be determined by thedepartmentdepartment, the California Housing Finance Agency, and the Department of Housing and Community Development, collectively, and in consultation with the appropriate local agencies. (b) For purposes of this section, "underserved veterans" means those veterans either experiencing or at risk of experiencing homelessness at a disproportionate rate to their veteran or nonveteran counterparts, as determined by the most recent United States Department of Housing and Urban Development Annual Homeless Assessment Report (AHAR) to Congress,November 2015,that includes an assessment of veteran homelessness, or other similar source the department, the California Housing Finance Agency, and the Department of Housing and Community Development collectively deem appropriate. (c) The department, the California Housing Finance Agency, and the Department of Housing and Community Development collectively shall determine the percentage of funds from the Housing for Veterans Fund, established pursuant to Section998.44,998.544, to be reserved annually pursuant to subdivision (a), with the first determination to be made on July 1, 2017, and thereafter each year on July 1. The determination shall be made using the mostrecently released AHAR to Congress, November 2015, that includes an assessment of veteran homelessness, or other similar source that the department, the California Housing Finance Agency, and the Department of Housing and Community Development collectively deem appropriate.recent determination of underserved veterans made pursuant to subdivision (b). (d) If there are insufficient applications for proposed housing projects meeting the requirements of subdivision (a), the reserved funding shall revert back to the Housing for Veterans Fund and be available for other purposes authorized by the act.