BILL NUMBER: SB 387INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Jackson FEBRUARY 24, 2015 An act to amend Section 6140 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 387, as introduced, Jackson. Attorneys: annual membership fees. Existing law, the State Bar Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of attorneys by the State Bar of California, a public corporation. The State Bar is governed by a board of trustees. Existing law authorizes the board, among other duties, to aid in all matters pertaining to the improvement of the administration of justice, including all matters that may advance the professional interests of the members of the State Bar. Existing law, beginning January 1, 2015, until January 1, 2016, requires the board to charge an annual membership fee for active members of up to $315 for 2015. This bill would, until January 1, 2017, require the board to charge that annual membership fee for 2016. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6140 of the Business and Professions Code, as amended by Section 3 of Chapter 429 of the Statutes of 2014, is amended to read: 6140. (a) The board shall fix the annual membership fee for active members for20152016 at a sum not exceeding three hundred fifteen dollars ($315). (b) The annual membership fee for active members is payable on or before the first day of February of each year. If the board finds it appropriate and feasible, it may provide by rule for payment of fees on an installment basis with interest, by credit card, or other means, and may charge members choosing any alternative method of payment an additional fee to defray costs incurred by that election. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1,2016,2017, and, as of that date, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1,2016,2017, deletes or extends that date.