California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB409 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/25/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 409INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator De Len FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to amend Section 313.5 of the Education Code, relating to English learners. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 409, as introduced, De Len. English learners: reclassification. (1) Existing law required the State Department of Education, by January 1, 2014, to review and analyze the criteria, policies, and practices that a sampling of school districts that represent the geographic, socioeconomic, and demographic diversity of school districts in the state use to reclassify English learners and recommend to the Legislature and the State Board of Education any guideline, regulatory, or statutory changes that the department determines are necessary to identify when English learners are prepared for the successful transition to classrooms and curricula that require English proficiency. This bill would instead require the department, by January 1, 2017, to contract with an outside research organization to perform the above-mentioned review and analysis. The bill would require the department to examine, as part of this review and analysis, information on English learner achievement as described in local control and accountability plans. (2) Existing law required the department, by January 1, 2014, to issue a report on its findings, research, analysis, recommendations, and best practices, and requires the department, by January 1, 2017, to issue an updated report that reflects any changes in analysis and recommendations as a result of the adoption by the state board of the common core standards and related English language development standards. This bill would change the issue date of this report to January 1, 2017, and would change the issue date of the updated report to January 1, 2018. This bill would also make nonsubstantive changes to these provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 313.5 of the Education Code is amended to read: 313.5. (a) By January 1,  2014,   2017,  the department shall  contract with an outside research organization to  review and analyze the criteria, policies, and practices that a sampling of school districts that represent the geographic, socioeconomic, and demographic diversity of school districts in the state use to reclassify English learners, and recommend to the Legislature and state board any guideline, regulatory, or statutory changes that the department determines are necessary to identify when English learners are prepared for the successful transition to classrooms and curricula that require English proficiency. (b) For purposes of completing the review and analysis required pursuant to subdivision (a), the department shall consult with parents of English learners, experts with demonstrated experience in developing and administering assessments for English learners, classroom or resource teachers, or both, school district administrators with expertise in curriculum, instruction, assessment, and accountability, and researchers possessing expertise in the education of English learners. (c) The group of experts described in subdivision (b) shall develop a study design that may include a sampling methodology for purposes of selecting the school districts that will be part of the review and analysis to identify best practices pursuant to subdivision (a). (d) For purposes of completing the review and analysis required pursuant to subdivision (a), the department shall examine and report on the following: (1) The practices and standards used by a sampling of school districts that represent the geographic, socioeconomic, and demographic diversity of school districts in the state to meet the four reclassification criteria specified in subdivision (f) of Section 313. (2) The extent to which school districts are following the guidelines established by the state board. (3) The range of reclassification criteria developed by school districts. (e) As part of the examination required pursuant to subdivision (d), the department shall analyze the following: (1) English language proficiency and academic performance data. (2) The relationship of the reclassification criteria to reclassification rates. (3) The academic performance of pupils after reclassification as English proficient. (4) The relationship of the reclassification criteria to the academic performance of pupils after reclassification.  (5) Information on English learner achievement as described in the local control and accountability plans developed by school districts pursuant to Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 52060) of Chapter 6.1 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2.  (f) In its report, the department also shall identify any other pupil outcome measures that indicate an English learner is prepared to successfully transition to a classroom and curricula that require English proficiency. (g) By January 1,  2014,   2017,  the department shall issue a report that includes the department's findings, research, analysis, recommendations, and best practices pursuant to subdivisions (a), (d),  (e,)   (e),  and (f). (h) By January 1,  2017,   2018,  the department shall issue an updated report that reflects any changes in analysis and recommendations as a result of the adoption by the state board of the common core standards pursuant to Section 60605.8 and the English language development standards adopted pursuant to  former  Section  60811.3.   60811.3, as that section read on June 30, 2013.  (i) This section shall be implemented only if state or federal funds are appropriated as necessary to fully fund this purpose or if private funds are made available as necessary to fully fund this purpose.