California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB423 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/01/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 423AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 1, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 21, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 31, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 6, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 3, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Bates FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to add Section 25218.14 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 423, as amended, Bates.  Consumer   Surplus household consumer  product waste: management. Existing law requires the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, in consultation with the Department of Toxic Substances Control, to develop and implement a public information program to provide uniform and consistent information on the proper disposal of hazardous substances found in and around homes. Existing law provides for regulation of the disposition of hazardous waste by the Department of Toxic Substances Control. This bill would require the Department of Toxic Substances Control to convene a Retail Waste Working Group, as prescribed, to consider and make  findings and  recommendations relating to requirements for the management of  surplus   household  consumer products that are wastes,   products,  waste reduction opportunities for  consumer   those  products, and  hazardous  waste management  requirements in the retail industry,   requirements,  as specified. The bill would require the working group to report these  findings and  recommendations to the Legislature by June 1, 2017. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25218.14 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 25218.14. (a) The department shall convene a Retail Waste Working Group comprised of representatives of large retailers, small retailers, district attorneys, certified unified program agencies, nongovernment organizations, other relevant state agencies as determined by the department, manufacturers, reverse distributors, and other stakeholders to consider and make  findings and  recommendations on the following: (1) Regulatory and  policy   statutory  requirements that may be considered confusing or may need clarification or specification when applied to the overall management  by manufacturer, distributor, supplier, vendor, retail, and reverse logistics facilities  of  surplus household  consumer  products that are wastes,   products,  including  those   products  that  are   can be  considered hazardous  wastes when the   waste or pharmaceutical waste once a  waste determination is made. (2) Consensus policy or   Statutory or  regulatory recommendations to facilitate and increase  the donation, liquidation, and sale of surplus household consumer products and  waste reduction opportunities for  consumer   those  products and to clarify  hazardous  waste management requirements  in the retail industry  to encourage  safe and efficient options for managing waste and   the management of  surplus  household  consumer  products.   products by manufacturer, distributor, supplier, vendor, retail, and reverse logistics facilities   in a manner that is protective of public health and the environment.   (b) For purposes of this section, "surplus household consumer product" means a household consumer product that cannot or will not be sold to a consumer through that product's primary market.   (b)   (c)  By June 1, 2017, the Retail Waste Working Group shall report the  findings and  recommendations made pursuant to subdivision (a) to the Legislature.