California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB466 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/25/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 466INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Hill FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to amend Sections 2701 and 2708 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to nursing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 466, as introduced, Hill. Board of Registered Nursing. The Nursing Practice Act provides for the licensure and regulation of registered nurses by the Board of Registered Nursing within the Department of Consumer Affairs, and requires the board to appoint an executive officer to perform duties delegated by the board. The act repeals the authority of the board and its executive officer on January 1, 2016. This bill would extend the repeal date to January 1, 2020. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2701 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 2701. (a) There is in the Department of Consumer Affairs the Board of Registered Nursing consisting of nine members. (b) For purposes of this chapter, "board," or "the board," refers to the Board of Registered Nursing. Any reference in state law to the Board of Nurse Examiners of the State of California or the California Board of Nursing Education and Nurse Registration shall be construed to refer to the Board of Registered Nursing. (c) The board shall have all authority vested in the previous board under this chapter. The board may enforce all disciplinary actions undertaken by the previous board. (d) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2016,   2020,  and as of that date, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1,  2016,   2020,  deletes or extends that date. Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the repeal of this section renders the board subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature. SEC. 2. Section 2708 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 2708. (a) The board shall appoint an executive officer who shall perform the duties delegated by the board and who shall be responsible to it for the accomplishment of those duties. (b) The executive officer shall be a nurse currently licensed under this chapter and shall possess other qualifications as determined by the board. (c) The executive officer shall not be a member of the board. (d) Notwithstanding any other  provision of  law, the person serving on December 31, 2011, as executive officer of the board shall serve as an interim executive officer until the board appoints a permanent executive officer. The board may appoint this interim executive officer as the permanent executive officer. (e) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2016,   2020,  and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1,  2016,   2020,  deletes or extends that date.