California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB519 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/10/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 519ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 10, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 16, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 2, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hancock (Coauthor: Senator Leno) FEBRUARY 26, 2015 An act to add Section 3051.1 to the Penal Code, relating to parole. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 519, Hancock. Youth offender parole hearings. Existing law generally requires the Board of Parole Hearings to conduct youth offender parole hearings to consider the release of offenders who committed specified crimes when they were under 18 years of age and who were sentenced to state prison. This bill would change the dates by which the board is required to complete certain youth offender parole hearings. The bill would become operative only if SB 261 is enacted and takes effect on or before January 1, 2016. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 3051.1 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 3051.1. (a) Notwithstanding subdivision (i) of Section 3051, the board shall complete all youth offender parole hearings for individuals who were sentenced to indeterminate life terms and who become entitled to have their parole suitability considered at a youth offender parole hearing on the effective date of the act that added subparagraph (A) of paragraph (2) of subdivision (i) of Section 3051 by January 1, 2018. (b) Notwithstanding subdivision (i) of Section 3051, the board shall complete all youth offender parole hearings for individuals who were sentenced to determinate terms and who become entitled to have their parole suitability considered at a youth offender parole hearing on the effective date of the act that added subparagraph (B) of paragraph (2) of subdivision (i) of Section 3051 by December 31, 2021. The board shall, for all individuals described in this subdivision, conduct the consultation described in subdivision (a) of Section 3041 before January 1, 2018. SEC. 2. This act shall become operative only if Senate Bill 261 is enacted and takes effect on or before January 1, 2016.