BILL NUMBER: SB 597INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Huff FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Section 48315 of the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 597, as introduced, Huff. Pupil attendance: interdistrict transfers. Existing law authorizes the governing board of any school district to accept interdistrict transfers of pupils in accordance with a policy adopted by resolution, and sets forth various requirements in that regard, including, among other things, requirements relating to attendance priorities, applications for transfer, and the calculation of average daily attendance. Existing law imposes certain reporting requirements in connection with interdistrict transfers to certain school districts and county offices of education, the Superintendent of Public Instruction, and the Department of Finance, and requires the Department of Finance to report specified information to the Legislative Analyst, upon request. Existing law makes those provisions inoperative on July 1, 2016, and repeals them on January 1, 2017. This bill would extend those inoperative and repeal dates to July 1, 2017, and January 1, 2018, respectively. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 48315 of the Education Code is amended to read: 48315. This article shall become inoperative on July 1,2016,2017, and, as of January 1,2017,2018, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, which becomes effective on or before January 1,2017,2018, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.