California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB597 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/15/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 597AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 15, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Huff FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend  Section   Sections  48315  and 48316  of the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 597, as amended, Huff. Pupil attendance: interdistrict transfers.  Existing   (1)     Existing  law authorizes the governing board of any school district to accept interdistrict transfers of pupils in accordance with a policy adopted by resolution, and sets forth various requirements in that regard, including, among other things, requirements relating to attendance priorities, applications for transfer, and the calculation of average daily attendance. Existing law imposes certain reporting requirements in connection with interdistrict transfers to certain school districts and county offices of education, the Superintendent of Public Instruction, and the Department of Finance, and requires the Department of Finance to report specified information to the Legislative Analyst, upon request. Existing law makes those provisions inoperative on July 1, 2016, and repeals them on January 1, 2017. This bill would extend those inoperative and repeal dates to July 1, 2017, and January 1, 2018, respectively.  (2) Existing law requires the Legislative Analyst to conduct, after consulting with appropriate legislative staff, a comprehensive evaluation of the interdistrict transfer program, and recommendations regarding the extension of the program. Existing law requires the evaluation to be completed and submitted, as specified, by November 1, 2014.   This bill would instead require the evaluation to be completed and submitted, as specified, by November 1, 2016.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 48315 of the Education Code is amended to read: 48315. This article shall become inoperative on July 1, 2017, and, as of January 1, 2018, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, which becomes effective on or before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.  SEC. 2.   Section 48316 of the   Education Code   is amended to read:  48316. The Legislative Analyst shall conduct, after consulting with appropriate legislative staff, a comprehensive evaluation of the interdistrict transfer program established pursuant to this article and recommendations regarding the extension of the program. The evaluation shall incorporate the data described in Section 48313 and shall be completed and submitted, along with the recommendations regarding extension, to the appropriate education policy committees of the Legislature and the Governor by November 1,  2014.   2016.