California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB652 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/06/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 652AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Allen FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act  to amend Section 60200.9 of the Education Code,  relating to  education finance.   instructional materials.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 652, as amended, Allen.  Education finance: local control funding formula: regional occupational centers or programs.   Instructional materials: revised curriculum frameworks: science.   Existing law requires the Instructional Quality Commission to recommend, and the State Board of Education to adopt, curriculum frameworks, as provided. Existing law requires the state board to consider the adoption of a revised curriculum framework and evaluation criteria for instructional materials in science on or before January 31, 2016, as specified.   This bill would instead require the state board to consider the above-specified adoption and evaluation criteria on or before January 31, 2017.   Existing law establishes a public school financing system that requires state funding for county superintendents of schools, school districts, and charter schools to be calculated pursuant to a local control funding formula, as specified. As part of the local control funding formula, existing law prohibits, for the 2013-14 and 2014-15 fiscal years only, a school district that received funds on behalf of, or provided funds to, a regional occupational center or program joint powers agency for purposes of providing instruction to secondary pupils from redirecting that funding for another purpose, except as provided.   This bill would state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation relating to the local control funding formula and regional occupational centers or programs.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 60200.9 of the   Education Code   is amended to read:  60200.9.  Notwithstanding Section 60200.7, on   On  or before January 31,  2016,   2017,  the state board shall consider the adoption of a revised curriculum framework and evaluation criteria for instructional materials in science. The revised curriculum framework shall be based on the science content standards adopted pursuant to  former  Section  60605.85.   60605.85, as that section read on June 30, 2014.  In adopting the revised curriculum framework, the state board shall ensure both of the following: (a) Inclusion of English language development strategies that are aligned to the standards adopted pursuant to Section 60811. (b) Inclusion of strategies to address the needs of pupils with disabilities.  SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation relating to the local control funding formula and regional occupational centers or programs.