California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB664 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/30/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 664AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hertzberg  (   Coauthor:   Senator   Hill   )  FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to  amend   add  Section  10540 of   10632.5 to  the Water Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 664, as amended, Hertzberg. Water:  integrated regional water management planning.   urban water management planning.   Existing law, the Urban Water Management Planning Act, requires every urban water supplier to prepare and adopt an urban water management plan for submission to the Department of Water Resources and other entities that includes specified content, including an urban water shortage contingency analysis. Existing law requires this analysis to include actions to be undertaken by the urban water supplier to prepare for, and implement during, a catastrophic interruption of water supplies, including an earthquake. Existing law requires an urban water supplier to update its plan at least once every 5 years on or before December 31, in years ending in 5 and 0, except that the 2015 plan is required to be updated and submitted to the department by July 1, 2016.   This bill would require an urban water supplier to include within its plan a seismic risk assessment and mitigation plan to assess the vulnerability of each of the various facilities of a water system and mitigate those vulnerabilities. This bill would require the urban water supplier to submit the seismic risk assessment and mitigation plan by July 1, 2017. This bill would authorize an urban water supplier to comply with this requirement by submitting a copy of an adopted local hazard mitigation plan or multihazard mitigation plan under specified federal law that addresses seismic risk.   Existing law, the Integrated Regional Water Management Planning Act, authorizes a regional water management group to prepare and adopt an integrated regional water management plan. The act requires an integrated regional water management plan to address specified water quality and water supply matters.   This bill would require an integrated regional water management plan to additionally address identification and consideration of the seismic vulnerability of water infrastructure within the boundaries of the plan.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Sect   ion 10632.5 is added to the   Water Code   , to read:   10632.5. (a) In addition to the requirements of paragraph (3) of subdivision (a) of Section 10632, the plan shall include a seismic risk assessment and mitigation plan to assess the vulnerability of each of the various facilities of a water system and mitigate those vulnerabilities. (b) An urban water supplier may comply with this section by submitting, pursuant to Section 10644, a copy of an adopted local hazard mitigation plan or multihazard mitigation plan under the federal Disaster Mitigation Act of 2000 (Public Law 106-390) if the local hazard mitigation plan or multihazard mitigation plan addresses seismic risk. (c) (1) An urban water supplier is not required to include the seismic risk assessment and mitigation plan in the urban water management plan update due on July 1, 2016. (2) An urban water supplier shall submit, pursuant to Section 10644, the seismic risk assessment and mitigation plan by July 1, 2017. (3) An urban water supplier shall update the seismic risk assessment and mitigation plan when updating its urban water management plan as required by Section 10621.   SECTION 1.   Section 10540 of the Water Code is amended to read: 10540. (a) A regional water management group may prepare and adopt an integrated regional water management plan in accordance with this part. (b) A regional water management group may coordinate its planning activities to address or incorporate all or part of any of the following actions of its members into its plan: (1) Groundwater management planning pursuant to Part 2.75 (commencing with Section 10750) or other specific groundwater management authority. (2) Urban water management planning pursuant to Part 2.6 (commencing with Section 10610). (3) The preparation of a water supply assessment required pursuant to Part 2.10 (commencing with Section 10910). (4) Agricultural water management planning pursuant to Part 2.8 (commencing with Section 10800). (5) City and county general planning pursuant to Section 65350 of the Government Code. (6) Stormwater resource planning that is undertaken pursuant to Part 2.3 (commencing with Section 10560). (7) Other water resource management planning, including flood protection, watershed management planning, and multipurpose program planning. (c) At a minimum, all plans shall address all of the following: (1) Protection and improvement of water supply reliability, including identification of feasible agricultural and urban water use efficiency strategies. (2) Identification and consideration of the drinking water quality of communities within the area of the plan. (3) Protection and improvement of water quality within the area of the plan, consistent with the relevant basin plan. (4) Identification of any significant threats to groundwater resources from overdrafting. (5) Protection, restoration, and improvement of stewardship of aquatic, riparian, and watershed resources within the region. (6) Protection of groundwater resources from contamination. (7) Identification and consideration of the water-related needs of disadvantaged communities in the area within the boundaries of the plan. (8) Identification and consideration of the seismic vulnerability of water infrastructure within the boundaries of the plan. (d) This section does not obligate a local agency to fund the implementation of any project or program.