BILL NUMBER: SB 664ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 1, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 24, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 2, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hertzberg (Coauthor: Senator Hill) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Campos) FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to add Section 10632.5 to the Water Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 664, Hertzberg. Water: urban water management planning. Existing law, the Urban Water Management Planning Act, requires every urban water supplier to prepare and adopt an urban water management plan for submission to the Department of Water Resources and other entities that includes specified content, including an urban water shortage contingency analysis. Existing law requires this analysis to include actions to be undertaken by the urban water supplier to prepare for, and implement during, a catastrophic interruption of water supplies, including an earthquake. Existing law requires an urban water supplier to update its plan at least once every 5 years on or before December 31, in years ending in 5 and 0, except that the 2015 plan is required to be updated and submitted to the department by July 1, 2016. This bill would require an urban water supplier to include within its plan, beginning January 1, 2020, a seismic risk assessment and mitigation plan to assess the vulnerability of each of the various facilities of a water system and mitigate those vulnerabilities. This bill would authorize an urban water supplier to comply with this requirement by submitting a copy of the most recent adopted local hazard mitigation plan or multihazard mitigation plan under specified federal law that addresses seismic risk. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 10632.5 is added to the Water Code, to read: 10632.5. (a) In addition to the requirements of paragraph (3) of subdivision (a) of Section 10632, beginning January 1, 2020, the plan shall include a seismic risk assessment and mitigation plan to assess the vulnerability of each of the various facilities of a water system and mitigate those vulnerabilities. (b) An urban water supplier shall update the seismic risk assessment and mitigation plan when updating its urban water management plan as required by Section 10621. (c) An urban water supplier may comply with this section by submitting, pursuant to Section 10644, a copy of the most recent adopted local hazard mitigation plan or multihazard mitigation plan under the federal Disaster Mitigation Act of 2000 (Public Law 106-390) if the local hazard mitigation plan or multihazard mitigation plan addresses seismic risk.