California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB758 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/30/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 758AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 8, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Block FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to add  Section 12805.4 to the Government   Article 8 (commenc   ing with Section 347) to Chapter 2.5 of Division 1 of the Water  Code, relating to climate change. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 758, as amended, Block. Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation Program. Existing law establishes the  Natural Resources Agency, comprised of departments, boards, conservancies, and commissions responsible for the restoration, protection, and management of the state's natural and cultural resources.   Department of Water Resources and requires the department to implement various water conservation and flood control programs and projects in the state.  This bill would establish the Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation Program in the  Natural Resources Agency   department  to research the causes and effects of atmospheric rivers, and to take actions to capture water generated by atmospheric rivers to increase the water supply and reliability of water resources in the state and to operate reservoirs in a manner that improves flood protection in the state. The bill would establish the Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation Fund in the State Treasury for the purposes of funding the program. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 12805.4 is added to the Government Code, to read: 12805.4.   SECTION 1.   Article 8 (commencing with Section 347) is added to Chapter 2.5 of Division 1 of the   Water Code  , to read:  Article  8.   Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation   347.  (a) The Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation Program is hereby established in the  Natural Resources Agency.   Department of Water Resources.  (b) Under the program, the  agency   department  shall research the causes and effects of atmospheric rivers, and shall take all actions within its existing authority to capture water generated by atmospheric rivers in order to increase the water supply and reliability of water resources in the state and to operate reservoirs in a manner that improves flood protection in the state. (c) The Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation Fund is hereby established in the State Treasury for the deposit of moneys to be expended by the  agency   department  for the program.