BILL NUMBER: SB 758AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 2, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 8, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Block FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 347) to Chapter 2.5 of Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to climate change. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 758, as amended, Block. Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation Program. Existing law establishes the Department of Water Resources and requires the department to implement various water conservation and flood control programs and projects in the state. This bill would establish the Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation Program in the departmenttoto, upon appropriation of special fund moneys, research the causes and effects of atmospheric rivers, and to take actions to capture water generated by atmospheric rivers to increase the water supply and reliability of water resources in the state and to operate reservoirs in a manner that improves flood protection in the state.The bill would establish the Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation Fund in the State Treasury for the purposes of funding the program.Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 8 (commencing with Section 347) is added to Chapter 2.5 of Division 1 of the Water Code, to read: Article 8. Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation 347. (a) The Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation Program is hereby established in the Department of Water Resources. (b)Under the program,Upon appropriation of special fund moneys, including, but not limited to, private funds, for these purposes, the department shall research the causes and effects of atmospheric rivers, and shall take all actions within its existing authority to capture water generated by atmospheric rivers in order to increase the water supply and reliability of water resources in the state and to operate reservoirs in a manner that improves flood protection in the state.(c) The Atmospheric Rivers Research and Mitigation Fund is hereby established in the State Treasury for the deposit of moneys to be expended by the department for the program.