California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB758 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/17/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 758AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 2, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 8, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Block FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 347) to Chapter 2.5 of Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to climate change. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 758, as amended, Block. Atmospheric  Rivers Research and Mitigation   Rivers: Research, Mitigation, and Climate Forecasting  Program. Existing law establishes the Department of Water Resources and requires the department to implement various water conservation and flood control programs and projects in the state. This bill would establish the Atmospheric  Rivers Research and Mitigation   Rivers: Research, Mitigation, and Climate Forecasting  Program in the department to, upon appropriation of special fund moneys, research  climate forecasting and  the causes and  effects of   impacts that climate change has on  atmospheric rivers,  and to take actions to capture water generated by atmospheric rivers to increase the water supply and reliability of water resources in the state and  to operate reservoirs in a manner that improves flood protection in the  state.   state, and to reopera   te flood control and water storage facilities to capture water generated by atmospheric rivers.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 8 (commencing with Section 347) is added to Chapter 2.5 of Division 1 of the Water Code, to read: Article 8. Atmospheric  Rivers Research and Mitigation   Rivers: Research, Mitigation, and Climate Forecasting  347. (a) The Atmospheric  Rivers Research and Mitigation   Rivers: Research, Mitigation, and Climate Forecasting  Program is hereby established in the Department of Water Resources. (b) Upon appropriation of special fund moneys, including, but not limited to, private funds, for these purposes, the department shall  conduct  research  relating to   climate forecasting and  the causes and  effects of   impacts that climate change has on  atmospheric rivers, and shall take all actions within its existing authority to  capture water generated by atmospheric rivers in order to increase the water supply and reliability of water resources in the state and to  operate reservoirs in a manner that improves flood protection in the  state.   state and to reoperate flood control and water storage facilities to capture water generated by atmospheric rivers, thereby increasing water supply,   hydropower availability, and the reliability of water resources in the state.