California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB758 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/09/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 758ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 2, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 8, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Block FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 347) to Chapter 2.5 of Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to climate change. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 758, Block. Atmospheric Rivers: Research, Mitigation, and Climate Forecasting Program. Existing law establishes the Department of Water Resources and requires the department to implement various water conservation and flood control programs and projects in the state. This bill would establish the Atmospheric Rivers: Research, Mitigation, and Climate Forecasting Program in the department to, upon appropriation of special fund moneys, research climate forecasting and the causes and impacts that climate change has on atmospheric rivers, to operate reservoirs in a manner that improves flood protection in the state, and to reoperate flood control and water storage facilities to capture water generated by atmospheric rivers. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 8 (commencing with Section 347) is added to Chapter 2.5 of Division 1 of the Water Code, to read: Article 8. Atmospheric Rivers: Research, Mitigation, and Climate Forecasting 347. (a) The Atmospheric Rivers: Research, Mitigation, and Climate Forecasting Program is hereby established in the Department of Water Resources. (b) Upon appropriation of special fund moneys, including, but not limited to, private funds, for these purposes, the department shall conduct research relating to climate forecasting and the causes and impacts that climate change has on atmospheric rivers, and shall take all actions within its existing authority to operate reservoirs in a manner that improves flood protection in the state and to reoperate flood control and water storage facilities to capture water generated by atmospheric rivers, thereby increasing water supply, hydropower availability, and the reliability of water resources in the state.