BILL NUMBER: SB 911AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hertzberg JANUARY 26, 2016 An act to amend Section 33384 of, and to repeal Section 33385ofof, the Education Code, relating to American Indian education programs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 911, as amended, Hertzberg. California American Indian education centers. Existinglawlaw, to be repealed on January 1, 2017, provides for the establishment of a California American Indian education center by any tribal group or incorporated American Indian association to meet specified objectives, and further provides for the administration of grants, upon application, by the State Department of Education for those purposes in accordance with specified provisions. Existing lawrepeals those provisions on January 1, 2017.requires the department, on or before January 1, 2011, and again on or before January 1, 2016, to report consolidated results for all California American Indian education centers, provide information required to evaluate the results, and make recommendations for program improvement. This bill would instead require the department to report the information on or before January 1, 2021, and every 5 years thereafter, and would specify that the information shall be reported to the appropriate fiscal and policy committees of the Legislature. The bill would also delete the January 1, 2017, repealdate, thereby extending the above-specified provisions indefinitely.date. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 33384 of the Education Code is amended to read: 33384. (a) (1) Each center shall annually submit a report to the department that includes appropriate data, presented in a format developed jointly with the department, that reflects each center's ability to meet its stated objectives, measure pupil academic performance, and meets the continued educational and cultural needs of the community that the center serves.(2) On or before January 1, 2011, and again on or before January 1, 2016, the department shall report consolidated results for all centers and supply information that is required for a comprehensive evaluation of those results, and make recommendations for program improvement.(2) On or before January 1, 2021, and every five years thereafter, the department shall report the following information to the appropriate fiscal and policy committees of the Legislature: (A) Consolidated results for all centers. (B) Information required to evaluate the consolidated results. (C) Recommendations for program improvement. (b) The centers shall maintain sound fiscal policies. The department shall provide technical assistance and training to the centers in order to assist the centers to maintain sound fiscal policies. The department may require an annual program audit, however, if the department deems it fiscally unsound for the centers to provide an annual audit, a fiscal review shall suffice. (c) The department shall provide technical assistance and professional development to the directors of the California American Indian education centers throughout the year that shall include timely documented responses and professional guidance meant to improve center programs.SECTION 1.SEC. 2. Section 33385 of the Education Code is repealed.