California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB917 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/31/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 917AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 30, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Jackson JANUARY 27, 2016 An act to add Section 219 to the Family Code, relating to family law. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 917, as amended, Jackson. Family law: court orders. Existing law authorizes a court to issue orders relating to matters under the Family Code, including, among others, restraining orders and orders for child support. This bill would require a court,  at   beginning July 1, 2017, within two court days after  the conclusion of a hearing conducted pursuant to the Family Code, to  provide   make available to  each party who is present at the hearing  with a written   a detailed, official  order setting forth the basic terms of any orders that were made in open court during the hearing. The bill would also require the Judicial Council, on or before January 1, 2018, to adopt a rule of court and any forms necessary to implement these provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 219 is added to the Family Code, to read: 219. (a)  At   Beginning July 1, 2017, within two court days after  the conclusion of a hearing conducted pursuant to this code, the court shall  provide   make available to  each party who is present at the hearing  with a written  a detailed, official  order setting forth the basic terms of any orders that were made in open court during the hearing. (b) This section does not require the court to prepare or provide a judgment of dissolution, legal separation, nullity, or parentage. (c) This section is not intended to impact the law governing statements of decisions. (d) This section does not preclude the court from requiring the parties or counsel to prepare an order, or accepting proposed orders or stipulations for orders from the parties or counsel at the time of the hearing. The court may, after providing the order described in subdivision (a), permit parties or counsel to submit more detailed orders after the hearing. (e) On or before January 1, 2018, the Judicial Council shall adopt a rule of court and any forms necessary to implement this section.