California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB917 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/23/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 917AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 30, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Jackson JANUARY 27, 2016 An act to add Section 219 to the Family Code, relating to family law. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 917, as amended, Jackson. Family law: court orders. Existing law authorizes a court to issue orders relating to matters under the Family Code, including, among others, restraining orders and orders for child support. This bill would require a court, beginning July 1, 2017,  unless a shorter time period is provided by another statute,  within two court days after the conclusion of a hearing conducted pursuant to the Family Code, to make available to each party who is present at the hearing a  written,  detailed, official order setting forth the basic terms of any orders that were made in open court during the hearing.  The bill would authorize the official order to be provided electronically and would require, to the extent practicable, the order to be provided to all parties present at the hearing before they leave the court that day.  The bill would also require the Judicial Council, on or before  January 1, 2018,   July 1, 2017,  to adopt a rule of court and any forms necessary to implement these provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 219 is added to the Family Code, to read: 219. (a)  Beginning   Unless a shorter time period is provided by another statute, beginning  July 1, 2017, within two court days after the conclusion of a hearing conducted pursuant to this code, the court shall make available to each party who is present at the hearing a  written,  detailed, official order setting forth the basic terms of any orders that were made in open court during the  hearing.   hearing. The order may be made available electronically. To the extent practicable, the court shall provide the order, in writing, to each party present at the hearing prior to the party leaving the court that day.  (b) This section does not require the court to prepare or provide a judgment of dissolution, legal separation, nullity, or parentage. (c) This section is not intended to impact the law governing statements of decisions. (d) This section does not preclude the court from requiring the parties or counsel to prepare an order, or accepting proposed orders or stipulations for orders from the parties or counsel at the time of the hearing. The court may, after providing the order described in subdivision (a), permit parties or counsel to submit more detailed orders after the hearing. (e) On or before  January 1, 2018,   July 1, 2017,  the Judicial Council shall adopt a rule of court and any forms necessary to implement this section.