California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB918 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/16/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 918AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 16, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 10, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 7, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Vidak JANUARY 27, 2016 An act to add Section 4041 to the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 918, as amended, Vidak. Common interest developments. Existing law, the Davis-Stirling Common Interest Development Act, defines and regulates common interest developments, which are managed by  a  homeowners'  association.   associations.  This bill would require the owners of the separate interests in a common interest development to annually provide the association with specified written information for the purpose of receiving  notice   notices  from the association. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4041 is added to the Civil Code, to read: 4041. (a) An owner of a separate interest shall, on an annual basis, provide written notice to the association of all of the following: (1) The  mailing  address or addresses to which notices from the association are to be delivered. (2) An alternate or secondary address to which notices from the association are to be delivered. (3) The name and address of his or her legal representative, if any, including any person with power of attorney or other person who can be contacted in the event of the owner's extended absence from the separate interest. (4) Whether the separate interest is owner-occupied, is rented out, if the parcel is developed but vacant, or if the parcel is undeveloped land. (b) The association shall solicit these annual notices of each owner  and   and, at least 30 days prior to making its own required disclosure under Section 5300, shall  enter the data into its books and  records at least 30 days prior to making its own required annual disclosures to members under Section 5300.   records.  (c) If an owner fails to provide the notices set forth in paragraphs (1) and (2) of subdivision (a), the property address shall be deemed to be the  mailing  address to which notices are to be delivered.