BILL NUMBER: SCR 109CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 31 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 4, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE FEBRUARY 25, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Stone FEBRUARY 12, 2016 Relative to California Pharmacists Outreach Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 109, Stone. California Pharmacists Outreach Week. This measure would declare February 12 through February 21, 2016, inclusive, as California Pharmacists Outreach Week. WHEREAS, The California Pharmacists Association-Academy of Student Pharmacists (CPhA-ASP) have coordinated "California Pharmacists Outreach Week," a statewide initiative to directly impact the community at large; and WHEREAS, This is the first joint initiative amongst student pharmacists to move health care outreach beyond the single community level; and WHEREAS, Collectively, 11 schools and colleges of pharmacy have combined forces to be one voice for the pharmacy profession; and WHEREAS, The schools involved are California Health Sciences University (CHSU), California Northstate University (CNU), Keck Graduate Institute (KGI), Loma Linda University (LLU), Touro University (TU), University of California - San Diego (UCSD), University of California - San Francisco (UCSF), University of the Pacific (UOP), University of Southern California (USC), West Coast University (WCU), and Western University of Health Sciences (WesternU); and WHEREAS, Starting February 12, 2016, student pharmacists across the state will reach out and directly serve the community with an emphasis on preventative care through various events, including, but not limited to, health fairs, blood drives, and poison prevention presentations; and WHEREAS, These events will address various health concerns including hypertension, diabetic care, high cholesterol, smoking cessation, immunizations, reproductive health, and many more; and WHEREAS, Preventative care tips will be distributed daily for student pharmacists to share with their colleagues and community; and WHEREAS, CPhA-ASP's outreach week is another example of how pharmacists will play a crucial role in health care advocacy in the coming years; and WHEREAS, CPhA-ASP plans to develop this outreach week into an annual event moving forward; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares February 12 through February 21, 2016, as California Pharmacists Outreach Week; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.