California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR115 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/16/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 115CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 107 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 16, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 7, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 11, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Liu FEBRUARY 24, 2016 Relative to Read Across America Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 115, Liu. Read Across America Day. This measure would recognize March 2, 2016, as Read Across America Day and would call upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities. WHEREAS, Reading is the building block to learning and the foundation for future success; and WHEREAS, Reading is a source of pleasure throughout life; and WHEREAS, In 1998, the National Education Association celebrated the Read Across America campaign to raise awareness about the importance of reading; and WHEREAS, The California Teachers Association celebrates Read Across America and the positive impact it has made in the schools and the State of California; and WHEREAS, Read Across America is a national celebration of reading that promotes literacy, reading, and adult involvement in the education of pupils, and is celebrated on March 2 in honor of Dr. Seuss's birthday; and WHEREAS, To celebrate the joy of reading, pupils, parents, teachers, sports figures, celebrities, firefighters, and business and community leaders are taking part in Read Across America events throughout the nation; and WHEREAS, On March 2, 2016, the National Education Association, the California Teachers Association, local schools, libraries, bookstores, businesses, and other community organizations will commemorate Read Across America Day; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes March 2, 2016, as Read Across America Day, and calls upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.