California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR117 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/05/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 117CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 96 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 5, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 12, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 1, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Pan MARCH 7, 2016 Relative to palliative care. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 117, Pan. Palliative care. This measure would encourage the State of California to study the status and importance of coordinated palliative care and to develop solutions, tools, and best practices for providing better patient-centered care and information to individuals with chronic diseases in California. WHEREAS, Palliative care means patient- and family-centered medical care that optimizes quality of life by anticipating, preventing, and treating suffering caused by serious illness; and WHEREAS, Palliative care administered throughout the continuum of illness involves addressing physical, emotional, social, and spiritual needs that facilitate patient autonomy, access to information, and choice; and WHEREAS, Palliative care includes, but is not limited to, discussions of the patient's goals for treatment, treatment options appropriate to the patient, including hospice care, and comprehensive pain and symptom management; and WHEREAS, All patients who are experiencing complex, chronic health issues that affect their quality of life should be offered palliative care as an option, as it is appropriate at any age and at any stage, and can be provided along with curative treatment; and WHEREAS, When palliative care programs are provided, a larger percentage of hospice patients are identified earlier in their eligibility window, which enables them to take advantage of these valuable services for a longer period of time; and WHEREAS, The United States healthcare system faces an increased burden with spikes in the senior citizen population coupled with increases in persons with complex chronic conditions and more people gaining access to health care through insurance coverage for the first time; and WHEREAS, Recent studies indicate that by closely matching treatment with a patient's goals and improving his or her quality of life, palliative care can provide substantial cost reduction; and WHEREAS, A population trained about the benefits of palliative care boosts our medical and social care workforce; and WHEREAS, The California Health and Human Services Agency's Let's Get Healthy California Task Force identified palliative care as one of its top priorities and indicators for all Californians to enjoy optimal health in its 2012 report; and WHEREAS, The formation of a state palliative care and quality of life interdisciplinary advisory council and a palliative care information and education program within the Department of Public Health would maximize the effectiveness of palliative care initiatives in the state by ensuring that comprehensive and accurate information and education about palliative care is available to the public, health care providers, and health care facilities; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature encourages the state to study the status and importance of coordinated palliative care as a patient quality of life issue, as a way to improve the quality and delivery of health care services, and as a way to more effectively spend limited health care dollars; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature encourages the state to develop solutions, tools, and best practices for providing better patient-centered care and information to individuals with chronic diseases in California; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.