California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR132 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/14/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 132INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Galgiani (Coauthors: Senators Allen, Bates, Beall, Berryhill, Block, Cannella, Fuller, Glazer, Hall, Hertzberg, Huff, Leyva, Monning, Morrell, Runner, Vidak, and Wieckowski) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Baker, Brough, Brown, Campos, Chang, Chvez, Chu, Dodd, Cristina Garcia, Gonzalez, Gordon, Gray, Grove, Kim, Low, Olsen, Quirk, Salas, Steinorth, and Wagner) APRIL 14, 2016 Relative to peace officers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 132, as introduced, Galgiani. California Peace Officers' Memorial Day. This measure would designate Monday, May 2, 2016, as California Peace Officers' Memorial Day, and would urge all Californians to honor those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, Monday, May 2, 2016, is California Peace Officers' Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers' Memorial Day; and WHEREAS, California peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and WHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; and WHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; and WHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic men and women who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes California's peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2015: Officer Michael J. Johnson, San Jose Police Department, End of Watch: March 24, 2015. Officer David J. Nelson, Bakersfield Police Department, End of Watch: June 26, 2015. Sergeant Scott P. Lunger, Hayward Police Department, End of Watch: July 22, 2015. Officer Bryce E. Hanes, San Bernardino Police Department, End of Watch: November 5, 2015; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature also recognizes California's peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled: Officer William H. Waggoner, Long Beach Police Department, End of Watch: December 18, 1954; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 2, 2016, as California Peace Officers' Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.